Central States Life & Health Company of Omaha v. MedAmerica Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Central States Life & Health Company of Omaha
Defendant: Medamerica insurance Company and Excellus Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00323
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 19 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #18 by Attorney Meghan E. Stoppel on behalf of Defendants Excellus Health Plan, Inc., MedAmerica Insurance Company.(Stoppel, Meghan)
October 20, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Meghan E. Stoppel on behalf of Defendants Excellus Health Plan, Inc., MedAmerica Insurance Company.(Stoppel, Meghan)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting 16 Email Motion. Corporate disclosure deadline for Excellus Health Plan and MedAmerica Insurance Company is extended to 10/29/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
October 19, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT EMAIL MOTION to extend deadline to file Corporate Disclosure Statement by Attorney Meghan E. Stoppel on behalf of Defendants Excellus Health Plan, Inc., MedAmerica Insurance Company.(RMW)
September 28, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant MedAmerica Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 28, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Excellus Health Plan, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to meghan.stoppel@nebraska.gov regarding Notice of Appearance #10 and Joint Stipulation #11 . E-mail resent to MStoppel@cozen.com. (LRM)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 20, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
September 17, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Attorney Meghan E. Stoppel on behalf of Defendants Excellus Health Plan, Inc., MedAmerica Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stoppel, Meghan)
September 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Meghan E. Stoppel on behalf of Defendants Excellus Health Plan, Inc., MedAmerica Insurance Company (Stoppel, Meghan)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant MedAmerica Insurance Company on 8/30/2021. (Jeffries, Richard)
September 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Excellus Health Plan, Inc. on 8/30/2021. (Jeffries, Richard)
August 27, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Plaintiff Central States Life & Health Company of Omaha.(Jeffries, Richard)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Excellus Health Plan, Inc. and MedAmerica Insurance Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Central States Life & Health Company of Omaha. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Jeffries, Richard)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint, #1 . (Jeffries, Richard)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Medamerica insurance Company, Excellus Health Plan, Inc., (filing fee $402, receipt number ANEDC-4463203) by Attorney Richard P. Jeffries on behalf of Central States Life & Health Company of Omaha (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Reinsurance Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Administrative Services Agreement)(Jeffries, Richard) Modified on 8/25/2021 to add the receipt number (LRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central States Life & Health Company of Omaha v. MedAmerica Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central States Life & Health Company of Omaha
Represented By: Richard P. Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medamerica insurance Company
Represented By: Meghan E. Stoppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excellus Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Meghan E. Stoppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?