Chernyy v. Roesler et al
Plaintiff: Anna J Chernyy and Anna J. Chernyy
Defendant: Monty Roesler, John Doe I, Alan Moore, Saline County Sheriff's Office, Saline County, Nebraska and Saline County
Case Number: 8:2021cv00366
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to defendant Monty Roesler. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to Monty Roesler regarding Amended Complaint #9 . (Walker, John)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant John Doe I, Alan Moore, Monty Roesler, Saline County Sheriff's Office, Saline County, Nebraska, by Attorney John M. Walker on behalf of Anna J. Chernyy(Walker, John)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #6 for attorney Taylor P. Foye. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #5 for attorney Joseph A. Kronawitter. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4493568 by Attorney Taylor P. Foye on behalf of Plaintiff Anna J. Chernyy.(Foye, Taylor)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4493551 by Attorney Joseph A. Kronawitter on behalf of Plaintiff Anna J. Chernyy.(Kronawitter, Joseph)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Taylor P. Foye has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joseph A. Kronawitter has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4480773), by Attorney John M. Walker on behalf of Anna J Chernyy(Walker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chernyy v. Roesler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna J Chernyy
Represented By: John M. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna J. Chernyy
Represented By: John M. Walker
Represented By: Joseph A. Kronawitter
Represented By: Taylor P. Foye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monty Roesler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?