Helm v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Plaintiff: Linda S. Helm
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 8:2021cv00367
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER granting #34 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Javier L. Merino is terminated as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 8, 2021 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Marc E. Dann on behalf of Plaintiff Linda S. Helm.(Dann, Marc)
October 8, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance of Marc E. Dann by Attorney Marc E. Dann on behalf of Plaintiff Linda S. Helm (Dann, Marc)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Joshua M. Link is terminated as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 7, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Sarah S. Mattingly on behalf of Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Mattingly, Sarah)
October 5, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION Motion to Refer the Reference by Attorney Sarah S. Mattingly on behalf of Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Mattingly, Sarah)
October 5, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Strike MOTION Motion to Refer the Reference #28 by Attorney Sarah S. Mattingly on behalf of Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Mattingly, Sarah)
October 5, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION Motion to Refer the Reference by Attorney Sarah S. Mattingly on behalf of Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation.(Mattingly, Sarah)
September 30, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Sarah S. Mattingly on behalf of Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Mattingly, Sarah)
September 22, 2021 Filing 26 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement 25 is stricken for the following reason(s): Entered by mistake, Corporate Disclosure Statement already filed at filing no. #7 . Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
September 22, 2021 Filing 25 *STRICKEN* TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO) Modified on 9/22/2021 to strike per strike order 26 (LKO).
September 22, 2021 Filing 24 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joshua M. Link has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 22, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Javier L. Merino has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
September 22, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
September 22, 2021 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:21-cv-10133. Original electronic file received.
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER discharging the Court's August 27, 2021 Order to Show Cause; this matter is TRANSFERRED to the District of Nebraska; the Clerk of the Court CLOSE this matter. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/21/2021. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
September 21, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION, filed by LINDA S. HELM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Payment Rejection, #2 Exhibit 2 - RFI #1 and Proof of Delivery, #3 Exhibit 3 - RFI #2 and Proof of Delivery, #4 Exhibit 4 - NOE #1 and Proof of Delivery, #5 Exhibit 5 - NOE #2 and Proof of Delivery, #6 Exhibit 6 - NOE #3 and Proof of Delivery, #7 Exhibit 7 - NOE #4 and Proof of Delivery, #8 Exhibit 8 - Response to NOE #2, #9 Exhibit 9 - Stewart Title Request, #10 Exhibit 10 - Stewart Title Correspondence, #11 Exhibit 11 - Payoff, #12 Exhibit 12 - NOE #5 and Proof of Delivery, #13 Exhibit 13 - CFPB Consumer Complaint Narratives, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(MERINO, JAVIER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The Court having reviewed Plaintiff`s certification submitted by Javier L. Merino, Esquire, [ECF No. 14] in response to the Order to Show Cause issued by the Hon. Renee Marie Bumb, U.S.D.J. [ECF No. 13]; and for good cause shown; it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file on the docket, the First Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to Mr. Merino`s certification [ECF No. 14-1] no later than September 20, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/15/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on October 5, 2021 at 11:00 am shall be held VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel shall utilize the following dial-in instructions for the conference 1-888-278-0296 Access code 2961061#. Additionally, the joint discovery plan shall be submitted via email to njdnef_king@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/14/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Initial Conference set for 10/5/2021 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 9/13/2021. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
September 10, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION.(LINK, JOSHUA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 Certification of Javier L. Merino on behalf of LINDA S. HELM Re 13 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint)(MERINO, JAVIER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER Pursuant to the parties' joint order filed August 10, 2021, Plaintiff had until August 17, 2021, to file an Amended Complaint. [Docket No. 12.] That deadline having passed without Plaintiff filing an Amended Complaint, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by no later than Tuesday, August 31, 2021, as to why this case should not be immediately transferred to the District of Nebraska. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/27/2021. (Costigan, Roberta) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiff has seven days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint and add a jury demand; ORDERED that upon the filing of an amended complaint, this case shall be transferred to the United States Bankruptcy Court in the District of Nebraska. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/10/2021. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
August 9, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Order Agreed Proposed Order Resolving Motion to Transfer Venue, Certificate of Service by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION re #6 MOTION to Change Venue . (LINK, JOSHUA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
July 12, 2021 AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #6 MOTION to Change Venue . (MERINO, JAVIER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT Local Rule 7.1.1 Statement by LINDA S. HELM. (MERINO, JAVIER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(eff. June 21, 2021), the parties, including intervening parties, are required to file a statement (separate from any pleading) containing specific information regarding third-party litigation funding. See L. Civ. R. 7.1.1(a)(1-3). This statement shall be filed within 45 days of the effective date of this Rule, or no later than August 5, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King on 7/6/21. (mb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Change Venue . Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (LINK, JOSHUA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(LINK, JOSHUA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time within which Defendant may answer, move or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 6/27/2021. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/27/2021. (tf, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation re: Request for Extension re #1 Complaint,,,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Consent Order Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint)(LINK, JOSHUA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA M. LINK on behalf of FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION (LINK, JOSHUA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Notice of Judicial Preferences RMB. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (alb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio no longer assigned to case. (mmb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12405312) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LINDA S. HELM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Payment Rejection, #2 Exhibit 2 - RFI #1 and Proof of Delivery, #3 Exhibit 3 - RFI #2 and Proof of Delivery, #4 Exhibit 4 - NOE #1 and Proof of Delivery, #5 Exhibit 5 - NOE #2 and Proof of Delivery, #6 Exhibit 6 - NOE #3 and Proof of Delivery, #7 Exhibit 7 - NOE #4 and Proof of Delivery, #8 Exhibit 8 - Response to NOE #2, #9 Exhibit 9 - Stewart Title Request, #10 Exhibit 10 - Stewart Title Correspondence, #11 Exhibit 11 - Payoff, #12 Exhibit 12 - NOE #5 and Proof of Delivery, #13 Exhibit 13 - CFPB Consumer Complaint Narratives, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Summons)(MERINO, JAVIER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helm v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S. Helm
Represented By: Javier L. Merino
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Joshua M. Link
Represented By: Sarah S. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?