Griffin v. Omaha Police Dept
Petitioner: Arthur James Griffin, Jr.
Respondent: Omaha Police Dept
Case Number: 8:2021cv00377
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Arthur James Griffin, Jr.. (LKO)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (filing #6 ) is granted. The next step in this case is for the court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Arthur James Griffin, Jr. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Douglas County Corrections. (LKO)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Arthur James Griffin, Jr..(LKO)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Petitioner Arthur James Griffin, Jr. (LKO)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: November 8, 2021: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address on behalf of Petitioner Arthur James Griffin, Jr. (LKO)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Arthur James Griffin, Jr. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Omaha Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur James Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Omaha Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?