Halo Synergy Group, et al v. Marsh and McLennan Agency, LLC
Plaintiff: Halo Synergy Group, Inc. and iDASaas, LLC
Defendant: Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00386
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF in support of AMENDED MOTION to Amend Motion to Dismiss #18 by Attorney Jordan Lewis on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC.(Lewis, Jordan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #22 for attorney Jordan Lewis. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 17, 2021 Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #21 for attorney Kristen D. Perkins. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 17, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4521517 by Attorney Jordan Lewis on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lewis, Jordan)
November 17, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4521498 by Attorney Kristen D. Perkins on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Perkins, Kristen)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend. Defendant shall file its reply brief in support of its Amended Motion to Dismiss #18 by November 24, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 16, 2021 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue DEFENDANTS DEADLINE FOR FILING A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION TO DISMISS, DOC NO. 18 by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC.(Olson, Stephen)
November 12, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED MOTION to Amend Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC.(Olson, Stephen)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Motion. Defendant is hereby granted leave to file an amended motion to dismiss to fix a clerical error. The amended motion shall be filed by November 15, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Motion to Dismiss to Fix Clerical Error by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Amended Motion to Dismiss (Short Motion Only) (003))(Olson, Stephen)
November 10, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss #11 by Attorney Andrew M. Collins on behalf of Plaintiffs Halo Synergy Group, Inc., iDASaas, LLC.(Collins, Andrew)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (LAC)
October 20, 2021 Filing 13 INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss #11 by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Olson, Stephen)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #11 by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC.(Olson, Stephen)
October 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC.(Olson, Stephen)
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC.(Olson, Stephen)
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent IDASAAS, LLC a Nebraska limited liability company for iDASaas, LLC. Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, Financial Interest, and Business Entity Citizenship by Attorney Andrew M. Collins on behalf of Plaintiffs iDASaas, LLC, IDASAAS, LLC a Nebraska limited liability company.(Collins, Andrew)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Halo Synergy Group, Inc. for Halo Synergy Group, Inc.. Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations, Financial Interest, and Business Entity Citizenship by Attorney Andrew M. Collins on behalf of Plaintiffs Halo Synergy Group, Inc., Halo Synergy Group, Inc..(Collins, Andrew)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 20, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC.(Olson, Stephen)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
October 1, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff iDASaas, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Halo Synergy Group, Inc.. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from Douglas County District Court, Case number CI 21-8456 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4487845) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Stephen G. Olson, II on behalf of Marsh and McLennan Agency, LLC a Delaware limited liability company(Olson, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halo Synergy Group, et al v. Marsh and McLennan Agency, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halo Synergy Group, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew M. Collins
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: iDASaas, LLC
Represented By: Andrew M. Collins
Represented By: Thomas J. Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC
Represented By: Kristina J. Kamler
Represented By: Stephen G. Olson, II
Represented By: Jordan Lewis
Represented By: Kristen D. Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?