Kellogg Company v. BCTGM International Union et al
Plaintiff: Kellogg Company
Defendant: BCTGM International Union, BCTGM Local 50G, BCTGM Local 3G, BCTGM Local 252G and BCTGM Local 374G
Case Number: 8:2021cv00391
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant BCTGM Local 252G has waived service and has until January 7, 2022 to answer the Complaint. In light of this, and keeping the Court's progression procedures in mind, the other defendants' answer deadlines are extended to December 15, 2021 as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
November 8, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant BCTGM Local 252G. Waiver sent on 11/8/2021. (Horvatich, Ruth)
November 4, 2021 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENT regarding Brief #26 by Attorney Ruth A. Horvatich on behalf of Plaintiff Kellogg Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Keith Eastland, #2 Exhibit 2A - October 29, 2021 NLRB Charge)(Horvatich, Ruth)
November 4, 2021 Filing 26 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #17 by Attorney Ruth A. Horvatich on behalf of Plaintiff Kellogg Company.(Horvatich, Ruth)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave. Plaintiff shall file its supplemental brief in opposition of Defendants' Motion to Extend #17 by November 5, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH) Modified on 11/4/2021 (LRH).
November 4, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Response to the Complaint by Attorney Ruth A. Horvatich on behalf of Plaintiff Kellogg Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Response Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadlines, #2 Supplement Index of Evidence in Support of Supplemental Response Brief, #3 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Brief, #4 Exhibit 2A to Supplemental Brief)(Horvatich, Ruth)
November 2, 2021 Filing 23 INDEX in support of MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #17 by Attorney Devki K. Virk on behalf of Defendants BCTGM International Union, BCTGM Local 252G, BCTGM Local 374G, BCTGM Local 3G, BCTGM Local 50G. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Virk, Devki)
November 2, 2021 Filing 22 BRIEF in support of MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #17 by Attorney Devki K. Virk on behalf of Defendants BCTGM International Union, BCTGM Local 252G, BCTGM Local 374G, BCTGM Local 3G, BCTGM Local 50G.(Virk, Devki)
November 1, 2021 Filing 21 INDEX in opposition to MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #17 Index in support of brief in opposition to Motion by Attorney Ruth A. Horvatich on behalf of Plaintiff Kellogg Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Horvatich Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1A- October 6 Letter, #3 Exhibit 1B- October 28 Email)(Horvatich, Ruth)
November 1, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading #17 by Attorney Ruth A. Horvatich on behalf of Plaintiff Kellogg Company.(Horvatich, Ruth)
October 28, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Devki K. Virk on behalf of Defendants BCTGM International Union, BCTGM Local 252G, BCTGM Local 374G, BCTGM Local 3G, BCTGM Local 50G (Virk, Devki)
October 28, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Timothy S. Dowd on behalf of Defendant BCTGM Local 50G (Dowd, Timothy)
October 28, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Timothy S. Dowd on behalf of Defendants BCTGM International Union, BCTGM Local 252G, BCTGM Local 374G, BCTGM Local 3G, BCTGM Local 50G.(Dowd, Timothy)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant BCTGM Local 374G on 10/18/2021. (Horvatich, Ruth)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant BCTGM Local 3G on 10/18/2021. (Horvatich, Ruth)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant BCTGM International Union on 10/18/2021. (Horvatich, Ruth)
October 18, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant BCTGM Local 50G on 10/14/2021. (Horvatich, Ruth)
October 12, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #4 for attorney Keith E. Eastland. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ruth A. Horvatich on behalf of Plaintiff Kellogg Company.(Horvatich, Ruth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to defendants BCTGM International Union, BCTGM Local 252G, BCTGM Local 374G, BCTGM Local 3G, and BCTGM Local 50G. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Requested as to BCTGM LOCAL 374G regarding Complaint,,, #1 . (Horvatich, Ruth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Requested as to BCTGM LOCAL 252G regarding Complaint,,, #1 . (Horvatich, Ruth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to BCTGM LOCAL 50G regarding Complaint,,, #1 . (Horvatich, Ruth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to BCTGM LOCAL 3G regarding Complaint,,, #1 . (Horvatich, Ruth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to BCTGM INTERNATIONAL UNION regarding Complaint,,, #1 . (Horvatich, Ruth)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4494704 by Attorney Keith E. Eastland on behalf of Plaintiff Kellogg Company.(Eastland, Keith)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Kellogg Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers and Grain Millers International Union, Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers, and Grain Millers Local 252G, Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers, and Grain Millers Local 374G, Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers, and Grain Millers Local 3G, Bakery, Confectionery, Tobacco Workers, and Grain Millers Local 50G ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4491820), by Attorney Ruth A. Horvatich on behalf of Kellogg Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CBA, #2 Exhibit 2 - MOA, #3 Exhibit 3 - 60-Day Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - Text, #5 Exhibit 5 - September 30 Email, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ken Hurley Email, #7 Exhibit 7 - Settlement Offer, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summary of Offer, #9 Exhibit 9 - Roger Text, #10 Exhibit 10 - 48-Hour Notification, #11 Exhibit 11 - Email with Slides, #12 Exhibit 12 - Union Response, #13 Exhibit 13 - October 4 Email)(Horvatich, Ruth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellogg Company v. BCTGM International Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellogg Company
Represented By: A. Stevenson Bogue
Represented By: Abigail M. Moland
Represented By: Ruth A. Horvatich
Represented By: Keith E. Eastland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCTGM International Union
Represented By: Devki K. Virk
Represented By: Timothy S. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCTGM Local 50G
Represented By: Devki K. Virk
Represented By: Timothy S. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCTGM Local 3G
Represented By: Devki K. Virk
Represented By: Timothy S. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCTGM Local 252G
Represented By: Devki K. Virk
Represented By: Timothy S. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCTGM Local 374G
Represented By: Devki K. Virk
Represented By: Timothy S. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?