Ravestein v. Douglas County, Nebraska et al
Plaintiff: Colleen Ravestein
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC, Douglas County, Nebraska, Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Mark Foxhall, Amber M. Redmond, John Morrison, William Shearon, Justin Teeter, Seth Van Maanen, William Young, Shane Peterson, Dennis McFarland, Anthony Roberts, Nicholas Schroeder, Andrew Worthing, Arturo Comacho, Deondre N. Hook, David L. Barnes, Trisha Portrey, Lori Limbach, Official Does 1-10, Staff Does 1-50, Nurse Does 1-10, Doctor Does 1-10 and Michael Myers
Case Number: 8:2021cv00442
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 30 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #17 by David L. Barnes, Arturo Comacho, Douglas County, Nebraska, Deondre N. Hook, Michael Myers, Shane Peterson, Amber M. Redmond, Anthony Roberts, Nicholas Schroeder, William Shearon, Seth Van Maanen, William Young (Dolan, Timothy)
January 6, 2022 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Renee A. Eveland on behalf of Defendant Wellpath, LLC.(Eveland, Renee)
January 6, 2022 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #17 by Lori Limbach, Trisha Portrey, Wellpath, LLC (Eveland, Renee)
December 22, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Michael Myers on 12/16/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Filing 26 Summons Returned Unexecuted Returned to Sender as to defendant Trisha Portrey. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Filing 25 Summons Returned Unexecuted Returned to Sender as to defendant Lori Limbach. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Filing 24 Summons Returned Unexecuted Returned to Sender as to defendant Dennis McFarland. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Returned Unexecuted Returned to Sender as to defendant Mark Foxhall. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Filing 22 Summons Returned Unexecuted Returned to Sender as to defendant John Morrison. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Filing 21 Summons Returned Unexecuted Returned to Sender as to defendant Justin Teeter. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 16, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Returned Unexecuted Returned to Sender as to defendant Andrew Worthing. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 14, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to defendant Michael Myers. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
December 13, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Requested as to Michael Myers regarding Amended Complaint #17 . (Welsh, Christopher)
December 13, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Christopher P. Welsh on behalf of Colleen Ravestein(Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Douglas County, Nebraska on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Wellpath, LLC on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David L. Barnes on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Deondre N. Hook on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Arturo Comacho on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Nicholas Schroeder on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Anthony Roberts on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Shane Peterson on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant William Young on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant William Shearon on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Amber M. Redmond on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Seth Van Maanen on 11/24/2021. (Welsh, Christopher)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendants David L. Barnes, Arturo Comacho, Douglas County, Nebraska, Mark Foxhall, Deondre N. Hook, Lori Limbach, Dennis McFarland, John Morrison, Shane Peterson, Trisha Portrey, Amber M. Redmond, Anthony Roberts, Nicholas Schroeder, William Shearon, Justin Teeter, Seth Van Maanen, Wellpath, LLC, Andrew Worthing, and William Young. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
November 21, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to All Defendants regarding Complaint,, #1 . (Welsh, Christopher)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against arturo Comacho, Doctor Does 1-10, Douglas County, Nebraska, Mark Foxhall, Lori Limbach, Dennis McFarland, John Morrison, Nurse Does 1-10, Official Does 1-10, Shane Peterson, Trisha Portrey, Amber M. Redmond, William Shearon, Staff Does 1-50, Justin Teeter, Seth Van Maanen, Wellpath LLC, f/k/a Correct Care Solutions, LLC, Andrew Worthing, William Young, david L barnes, deondre hook, anthony roberts, Nicholas schroeder ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4523465), by Attorney Christopher P. Welsh on behalf of Colleen Ravestein(Welsh, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravestein v. Douglas County, Nebraska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC
Represented By: Renee A. Eveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Renee A. Eveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Foxhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber M. Redmond
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Shearon
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Teeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Van Maanen
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Young
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Peterson
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Roberts
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Schroeder
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Worthing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Comacho
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deondre N. Hook
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Barnes
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisha Portrey
Represented By: Renee A. Eveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Limbach
Represented By: Renee A. Eveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Official Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Myers
Represented By: Timothy K. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Ravestein
Represented By: Christopher P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?