Pullens v. Ayaj et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Pullens
Defendant: Ayaj, Mr. Geerdes, Boyd, Hogan, Nelson, Locus, Frakes and NDCS
Case Number: 8:2021cv00478
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Filing #14 ) is denied. Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 25, 2022: check for response to show cause order. The court must be kept informed of Plaintiff's current address at all times while this case is pending. Plaintiff's failure to keep the court so informed may result in dismissal of the case without further notice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
February 22, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Reconsideration regarding Memorandum and Order #13 on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Pullens. (LKO)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Plaintiff's motion to withdraw complaint (Filing #12 ) is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Withdraw Complaint - Pro Se #1 on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Pullens. (LKO)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Filing #10 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
February 3, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration regarding Memorandum and Order #9 on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Pullens. (LKO)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court's Memorandum and Order of January 3, 2022, is withdrawn. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Filing #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay a full filing fee of $350.00 within 30 days unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) & 1915A. The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: February 22, 2022: initial partial filing fee due. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO) Modified on 1/24/2022 to reflect copy mailed to plaintiff's institution (LKO).
January 18, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Supplement on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Pullens. (LKO)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 *WITHDRAWN* MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing #2 ) is denied. Plaintiff shall pay the $402.00 filing fee no later than February 2, 2022. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: February 2, 2022: deadline for Plaintiff to pay $402.00 filing fee. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 2/2/2022: February 2, 2022: deadline for Plaintiff to pay $402.00 filing fee.) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR) Modified on 1/21/2022 to withdraw per Memorandum and Order #9 (LKO).
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2020-01: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
December 27, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (TCL)
December 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Pullens.(TCL)
December 27, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Stephen Pullens. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (TCL)
December 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Stephen Pullens.(TCL)
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Ayaj, Boyd, Frakes, Geerdes, Hogan, Locus, NDCS, Nelson. No Summons issued, filed on behalf of plaintiff Stephen Pullens. (TCL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2021: #1 Exhibits A through V) (TCL). Modified on 12/27/2021 to add restricted exhibits (TCL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pullens v. Ayaj et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Pullens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Geerdes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Locus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDCS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?