Johnson et al v. Douglas County, Nebraska
Plaintiff: Gayle M. Johnson and Brian Johnson
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska
Case Number: 8:2022cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend. Plaintiffs shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss #3 by March 9, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
February 16, 2022 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue brief due date to March 9, 2022 by Attorney Richard P. McGowan on behalf of Plaintiff Gayle M. Johnson.(McGowan, Richard)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion to dismiss #3 by February 23, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
January 29, 2022 Filing 6 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading Reply Brief by Attorney Richard P. McGowan on behalf of Plaintiffs Brian Johnson, Gayle M. Johnson.(McGowan, Richard)
January 12, 2022 Filing 5 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #3 by Attorney Joshua R. Woolf on behalf of Defendant Douglas County, Nebraska.(Woolf, Joshua)
January 12, 2022 Filing 4 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #3 by Attorney Joshua R. Woolf on behalf of Defendant Douglas County, Nebraska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Joshua Woolf, #2 Exhibit 1 A Contract between Douglas County and Wellpath)(Woolf, Joshua)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Joshua R. Woolf on behalf of Defendant Douglas County, Nebraska.(Woolf, Joshua)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska, Case number CI 21-6846 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BNEDC-4549713) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Joshua R. Woolf on behalf of Douglas County, Nebraska (Attachments: #1 Exhibit District Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons Served on Douglas County)(Woolf, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Douglas County, Nebraska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle M. Johnson
Represented By: Richard P. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Johnson
Represented By: Richard P. McGowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County, Nebraska
Represented By: Meghan M. Bothe
Represented By: Joshua R. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?