Sands et al v. Integrated Cardiology Group, L.L.C., et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Sands, Jason Goldberg and John Sands
Defendant: Integrated Cardiology Group, L.L.C., Bryan Health, Bryan Medical Center, Zachary M. Singsank and Robert A. Oakes
Case Number: 8:2022cv00072
Filed: February 23, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The Motion to Change Place of Trial is granted. (Filing No. #16 ). Defendants' Motion to Strike is denied as moot. (Filing No. #23 ). The trial of this case will be held in Lincoln, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL)
April 18, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike Index, #22 , Reply Brief, #21 by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Plaintiffs Jason Goldberg, John Sands, Kevin Sands.(Cullan, Patrick)
April 13, 2022 Filing 22 INDEX in support of MOTION to Change Place of Trial #16 by Attorney William L. Tannehill on behalf of Defendants Bryan Health, Bryan Medical Center, Integrated Cardiology Group, L.L.C., Robert A. Oakes, Zachary M. Singsank.(Tannehill, William)
April 13, 2022 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF in support of MOTION to Change Place of Trial #16 by Attorney William L. Tannehill on behalf of Defendants Bryan Health, Bryan Medical Center, Integrated Cardiology Group, L.L.C., Robert A. Oakes, Zachary M. Singsank.(Tannehill, William)
April 6, 2022 Filing 20 BRIEF in opposition to Brief, #17 , MOTION to Change Place of Trial #16 by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Plaintiffs Jason Goldberg, John Sands, Kevin Sands.(Cullan, Patrick)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/25/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
March 23, 2022 Filing 17 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Change Place of Trial #16 by Attorney William L. Tannehill on behalf of Defendants Bryan Health, Bryan Medical Center, Integrated Cardiology Group, L.L.C., Robert A. Oakes, Zachary M. Singsank.(Tannehill, William)
March 23, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Place of Trial by Attorney William L. Tannehill on behalf of Defendant Bryan Health.(Tannehill, William)
March 23, 2022 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 on behalf of Integrated Cardiology Group, LLC, Bryan Health, Bryan Medical Center, Zachary M. Singsank, D.O., and Robert A. Oakes, M.D. by Attorney William L. Tannehill on behalf of Defendant Bryan Health.(Tannehill, William)
March 23, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand on behalf of Integrated Cardiology Group, LLC, Bryan Medical Center, Zachary M. Singsank, D.O., Robert A. Oakes, M.D. and by Bryan Health (Tannehill, William)
March 16, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Zachary Singsank, MD defendant Zachary M. Singsank on 3/2/2022. (Cullan, Patrick)
March 16, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Robert Oakes, MD defendant Robert A. Oakes on 3/2/2022. (Cullan, Patrick)
March 16, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Integrated Cardiology Group defendant Integrated Cardiology Group, L.L.C. on 3/2/2022. (Cullan, Patrick)
March 16, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Bryan Medical Center defendant Bryan Medical Center on 3/2/2022. (Cullan, Patrick)
March 16, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Bryan Health defendant Bryan Health on 3/2/2022. (Cullan, Patrick)
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to defendant Bryan Health, Bryan Medical Center, Integrated Cardiology Group, L.L.C., Robert A. Oakes, and Zachary M. Singsank. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Requested as to Zachary Singsank, DO regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Robert Oakes, MD regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
February 24, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Requested as to Integrated Cardiology Group, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
February 24, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Bryan Medical Center regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
February 24, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Bryan Health regarding Complaint #1 . (Cullan, Patrick)
February 23, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
February 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4581828), by Attorney Patrick J. Cullan on behalf of Kevin Sands, John Sands, Jason Goldberg(Cullan, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sands et al v. Integrated Cardiology Group, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sands
Represented By: Joseph P. Cullan
Represented By: Patrick J. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Goldberg
Represented By: Joseph P. Cullan
Represented By: Patrick J. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sands
Represented By: Joseph P. Cullan
Represented By: Patrick J. Cullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrated Cardiology Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: William L. Tannehill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Health
Represented By: William L. Tannehill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Medical Center
Represented By: William L. Tannehill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary M. Singsank
Represented By: William L. Tannehill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Oakes
Represented By: William L. Tannehill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?