Maynard et al v. West Coast Cosmetics Inc.
Plaintiff: Erin Maynard and Mandy Maynard
Defendant: West Coast Cosmetics Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv00101
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2022 Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Case Dismissal. (LKO)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Dismissal by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Plaintiffs Erin Maynard, Mandy Maynard (Javitch, Mark)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant West Coast Cosmetics Inc. on 3/25/2022. (Javitch, Mark)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant West Coast Cosmetics Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to West Coast Cosmetics Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Javitch, Mark)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against West Coast Cosmetics Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4600677), by Attorney Mark L. Javitch on behalf of Erin Maynard, Mandy Maynard (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Javitch, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maynard et al v. West Coast Cosmetics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Maynard
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mandy Maynard
Represented By: Mark L. Javitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Cosmetics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?