Mose v. US Marshall
Petitioner: Trae Mose
Respondent: US Marshall
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2022cv00107
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Richard G Kopf
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT - PRO SE - Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order entered this date, the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is dismissed without prejudice. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This case is dismissed without prejudice because Petitioner failed to prosecute it and failed to comply with this courts orders. No certificate of appealability has been or will be issued. The court will enter judgment by a separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
April 11, 2022 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Trae Mose at Cass County Jail regarding Memorandum and Order #3 . Mail resent to Hall County Jail. (LKO)
April 4, 2022 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Trae Mose at Cass County Jail regarding Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) #2 . Mail not resent, no forwarding address. (LKO) Modified on 4/5/2022 to reflect mail resent to Hall County Jail per updated address and BOP inmate locator. (LKO).
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: May 2, 2022: Check for MIFP or payment. The clerk of the court is further directed to update the cause of action for this suit to a 28 U.S.C. 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) and to remove the Nebraska Attorney General as an interested party. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf of pro se petitioner Trae Mose. (LKO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mose v. US Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trae Mose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?