Morehead v. Fiserv Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Kimberly Morehead
Defendant: Fiserv Solutions, LLC and Fiserv, Inc
Case Number: 8:2022cv00120
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - Fiserv Solutions, LLC's motion is granted (Filing No. #13 ). The clerk is instructed to add Fiserv, Inc as a party defendant. On or before June 9, 2022, Plaintiff shall file any amended complaint. Defendants shall file any response to the operative pleading on or before July 7, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (MKR)
May 11, 2022 Filing 14 Plaintiff's ANSWER to Crossclaim by Kimberly Morehead (Aranza, Raymond)
May 11, 2022 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION Unopposed Motion to Join Fiserv, Inc., as a Necessary Party or in the alternative, as a Permissive Party by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Counter Claimant Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Defendant Fiserv Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Anthony S. Marino)(Wentz, Kenneth)
April 18, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #8 for attorney Gary B. Eidelman. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
April 18, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Garrett P. Buttrey. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
April 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Oath of Admission by Pro Hac Vice Applicant by Attorney Garrett P. Buttrey on behalf of Counter Claimant Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Defendant Fiserv Solutions, LLC (Buttrey, Garrett)
April 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Oath of Admission by Pro Hace Vice Applicant by Attorney Gary B. Eidelman on behalf of Counter Claimant Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Defendant Fiserv Solutions, LLC (Eidelman, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4616332 by Attorney Gary B. Eidelman on behalf of Counter Claimant Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Defendant Fiserv Solutions, LLC.(Eidelman, Gary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4616163 by Attorney Garrett P. Buttrey on behalf of Counter Claimant Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Defendant Fiserv Solutions, LLC.(Buttrey, Garrett)
April 11, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Fiserv Solutions, LLC regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 filed by Fiserv Solutions, LLC by Fiserv Solutions, LLC (Wentz, Kenneth)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Garrett P. Buttrey has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Gary B. Eidelman has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MLF)
April 4, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (ADB)
April 4, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Corporate Parent Fiserv Solutions, LLC for Fiserv Solutions, LLC. by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Defendants Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Fiserv Solutions, LLC, Fiserv Solutions, LLC.(Wentz, Kenneth)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Fiserv Solutions, LLC from Douglas County District Court Nebraska, Case number CI 22-1611 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4610320) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Kenneth M. Wentz, III on behalf of Fiserv Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wentz, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morehead v. Fiserv Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Morehead
Represented By: Raymond R. Aranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth M. Wentz, III
Represented By: Garrett P. Buttrey
Represented By: Gary B. Eidelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiserv, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?