Regency Court, L.L.C. v. Charming Charlie Big Red, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Regency Court, L.L.C.
Defendant: Charming Charlie Big Red, LLC and Charming Charlie Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv00121
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT - This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss. Filing #14 . Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LKO)
May 25, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Michael T. Eversden on behalf of Plaintiff Regency Court, L.L.C..(Eversden, Michael)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting 12 Text Email Motion. For good cause shown, the deadline for the parties to electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) which will fully dispose of the case is extended to June 8, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM)
May 9, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT EMAIL MOTION by counsel for Defendants requesting an extension of the deadline for the parties to electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) which will fully dispose of the case. (JLM)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - On or before May 9, 2022, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) which will fully dispose of the case. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of Court shall terminate the pretrial and trial settings, and any hearings set for this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/9/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
April 6, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Charming Charlie Big Red, LLC, Charming Charlie Brands, Inc. (Carney, Joel)
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Charming Charlie Brands, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Charming Charlie Big Red, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Regency Court, L.L.C. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
April 6, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Katie T. Cowart has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Simon W. Hendershot has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs from Douglas County District Court, Case number CI-22-1633 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4611396) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Joel M. Carney on behalf of Charming Charlie Brands, Inc., Charming Charlie Big Red, LLC(Carney, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regency Court, L.L.C. v. Charming Charlie Big Red, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regency Court, L.L.C.
Represented By: Lauren R. Goodman
Represented By: Michael T. Eversden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charming Charlie Big Red, LLC
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Katie T. Cowart
Represented By: Simon W. Hendershot, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charming Charlie Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Joel M. Carney
Represented By: Katie T. Cowart
Represented By: Simon W. Hendershot, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?