General Motors LLC v. Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: General Motors LLC
Defendant: Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc. and Huber Chevrolet, Inc.
Cross Claimant: Huber Cadillac, Inc., YABA, LLC and NBC Properties, LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv00157
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2022 Filing 33 REPLY BRIEF in opposition to Brief, #31 by Attorney Kristopher J. Covi on behalf of Defendant Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc..(Covi, Kristopher)
July 5, 2022 Filing 32 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT WOODHOUSE AUTO FAMILY INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT, CROSS-CLAIM AND COUNTERCLAIM #25 by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Counter Claimants Huber Cadillac, Inc., Huber Chevrolet, Inc., NBC Properties, LLC, YABA, LLC, Cross Claimants Huber Cadillac, Inc., Huber Chevrolet, Inc., NBC Properties, LLC, YABA, LLC, Defendants Huber Cadillac, Inc., Huber Chevrolet, Inc., NBC Properties, LLC, YABA, LLC.(Flood, Patrick)
July 5, 2022 Filing 31 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT WOODHOUSE AUTO FAMILY INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT, CROSS-CLAIM AND COUNTERCLAIM #25 by Attorney Robert W. Shively, Jr. on behalf of Counter Defendant General Motors LLC, Plaintiff General Motors LLC.(Shively, Robert)
June 22, 2022 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Gretchen L. McGill on behalf of Defendant Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc..(McGill, Gretchen)
June 21, 2022 Filing 29 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Matthew T. Payne has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TCL)
June 21, 2022 Filing 28 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
June 20, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Gretchen L. McGill on behalf of Defendant Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc. (McGill, Gretchen)
June 14, 2022 Filing 26 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT WOODHOUSE AUTO FAMILY INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT, CROSS-CLAIM AND COUNTERCLAIM #25 by Attorney Kristopher J. Covi on behalf of Defendant Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc..(Covi, Kristopher)
June 14, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM DEFENDANT WOODHOUSE AUTO FAMILY INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT, CROSS-CLAIM AND COUNTERCLAIM by Attorney Kristopher J. Covi on behalf of Defendant Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc..(Covi, Kristopher)
June 2, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY to Counterclaim by General Motors LLC (Shively, Robert)
May 12, 2022 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Cross Claimant NBC Properties, LLC, Defendant NBC Properties, LLC, Counter Claimant NBC Properties, LLC.(Flood, Patrick)
May 12, 2022 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Cross Claimant YABA, LLC, Defendant YABA, LLC, Counter Claimant YABA, LLC.(Flood, Patrick)
May 12, 2022 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Counter Claimant Huber Cadillac, Inc., Cross Claimant Huber Cadillac, Inc., Defendant Huber Cadillac, Inc..(Flood, Patrick)
May 12, 2022 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Patrick M. Flood on behalf of Counter Claimant Huber Chevrolet, Inc., Defendant Huber Chevrolet, Inc., Cross Claimant Huber Chevrolet, Inc..(Flood, Patrick)
May 12, 2022 Filing 19 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant NBC Properties, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
May 12, 2022 Filing 18 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant YABA, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
May 12, 2022 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Huber Cadillac, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
May 12, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Huber Chevrolet, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
May 11, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #6 , CROSSCLAIM against Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc. regarding Amended Complaint, #6 filed by General Motors LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against General Motors LLC regarding Amended Complaint, #6 filed by General Motors LLC by YABA, LLC, Huber Chevrolet, Inc., NBC Properties, LLC, Huber Cadillac, Inc. (Flood, Patrick)
May 4, 2022 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER regarding Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00, regarding filing #7 is refunded to the payor, Corey R. Nevers, receipt number ANEDC-4624951. Attorney was previously admitted full-time to the U.S. District Court of Nebraska. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 4, 2022 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER regarding Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00 regarding filing #8 is refunded to the payor, Mark T. Clouatre, receipt number ANEDC-4624959. Attorney was previously admitted full-time to the U.S. District Court of Nebraska. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 2, 2022 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert W. Shively, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff General Motors LLC.(Shively, Robert)
May 2, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Woodhouse Auto Family,Inc. (Amended) (Shively, Robert)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc.. Waiver sent on 4/29/2022. (Shively, Robert)
April 28, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Huber Cadillac, Inc.. Waiver sent on 4/27/2022; Huber Chevrolet, Inc.. Waiver sent on 4/27/2022; NBC Properties, LLC. Waiver sent on 4/27/2022; YABA, LLC. Waiver sent on 4/27/2022. (Shively, Robert)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mark T. Clouatre Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4624959 by Attorney Mark T. Clouatre on behalf of Plaintiff General Motors LLC.(Clouatre, Mark)
April 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Corey R. Nevers Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4624951 by Attorney Corey R. Nevers on behalf of Plaintiff General Motors LLC.(Nevers, Corey)
April 27, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Huber Cadillac, Inc., Huber Chevrolet, Inc., NBC Properties, LLC, Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc., YABA, LLC, by Attorney Robert W. Shively, Jr. on behalf of General Motors LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shively, Robert)
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Corey R. Nevers has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Mark T. Clouatre has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff General Motors LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Huber Cadillac, Inc., Huber Chevrolet, Inc., NBC Properties, LLC, Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc., YABA, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4621990), by Attorney Robert W. Shively, Jr. on behalf of General Motors LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shively, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Motors LLC v. Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Robert W. Shively, Jr.
Represented By: Corey R. Nevers
Represented By: Mark T. Clouatre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodhouse Auto Family, Inc.
Represented By: Gretchen L. McGill
Represented By: Kristopher J. Covi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huber Chevrolet, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. Payne
Represented By: Patrick M. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Huber Cadillac, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M. Flood
Represented By: Matthew T. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: YABA, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Payne
Represented By: Patrick M. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: NBC Properties, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Payne
Represented By: Patrick M. Flood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?