Francis v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Adam Francis
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2022cv00169
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendants Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney General, and U.S. Attorney's Office. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to Commissioner of Social Security regarding Complaint #1 . (Kappelman, Wes)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and the complaint shall be filed without payment of fees. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Memorandum and Order together with three summons forms and three USM-285 forms to Plaintiff's attorney of record for service of process on the United States. This order is entered without prejudice to the court later entering an order taxing costs in this case. No one, including any plaintiff, is relieved by this order from the obligation to pay or to reimburse taxable costs after this action is over. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to plaintiff's counsel as directed with 3 summons/USM-285 forms)(MKR) Modified on 5/5/2022 to reflect copy mailed to counsel(MKR).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2015-05: In the Matter of Procedures for Social Security Cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JES)
May 4, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Attorney Wes Kappelman on behalf of Plaintiff Adam Francis.(Kappelman, Wes)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi, by Attorney Wes Kappelman on behalf of Adam Francis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kappelman, Wes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Francis
Represented By: Wes Kappelman
Represented By: Kimberly F. Schram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?