Hill-Green v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa Hill-Green
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Petitioner: Data Axle, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv00180
Filed: May 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend. Respondent shall respond to the Motion to Quash #1 by August 8, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
July 7, 2022 Filing 19 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Quash by Attorney Joseph C. Hashmall on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Hill-Green.(Hashmall, Joseph)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Geoffrey Irwin is terminated as counsel of record. The Clerk of Court shall terminate future notices to Geoffrey Irwin in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
June 29, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Coyle, Michael)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Extend. Respondent shall respond to the Motion to Quash by July 8, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
June 16, 2022 Filing 15 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Quash (2d) by Attorney Joseph C. Hashmall on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Hill-Green.(Hashmall, Joseph)
June 3, 2022 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER regarding Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 . Pro Hac Vice admission fee in the amount of $100.00 is refunded to the payor, Kerry Fowler, receipt number ANEDC-4646428. Filing #12 was filed erroneously. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
June 2, 2022 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #11 for attorney Kerry C. Fowler. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
June 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4646428 by Attorney Kerry C. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Fowler, Kerry)
June 1, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4646395 by Attorney Kerry C. Fowler on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Fowler, Kerry)
May 31, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Michael F. Coyle on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Coyle, Michael)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend #8 . Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Quash #1 by June 17, 2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
May 23, 2022 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Motion to Quash Subpoena by Attorney John G. Albanese on behalf of Plaintiff Lisa Hill-Green.(Albanese, John)
May 16, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kerry Fowler has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
May 16, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Geoffrey Irwin has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
May 16, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Joseph Hashmall has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
May 13, 2022 Filing 3 INDEX in support of MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4635500) #1 by Attorney Cody B. Nickel on behalf of Movant Data Axle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Nickel, Cody)
May 13, 2022 Filing 2 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4635500) #1 by Attorney Cody B. Nickel on behalf of Movant Data Axle, Inc..(Nickel, Cody)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4635500), by Attorney Cody B. Nickel on behalf of Data Axle, Inc.(Nickel, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill-Green v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hill-Green
Represented By: Joseph Hashmall
Represented By: John G. Albanese
Represented By: Joseph C. Hashmall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey Irwin
Represented By: Kerry Fowler
Represented By: Kerry C. Fowler
Represented By: Michael F. Coyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Data Axle, Inc.
Represented By: Cody B. Nickel
Represented By: Gregory C. Scaglione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?