Ballinger v. Gustafson et al
Plaintiff: John Ballinger
Defendant: Matthew Mark Gustafson and KSMG, LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv00213
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. re #8 Defendant, Matthew Mark Gustafson, shall have an extension of time to August 18, 2022, to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Joel E. Feistner on behalf of Defendant Matthew Mark Gustafson.(Feistner, Joel)
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Matthew Mark Gustafson on 6/28/2022. (Atterbury, Tony)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Service of First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant KSMG, LLC by Attorney Tony L. Atterbury on behalf of Plaintiff John Ballinger.(Atterbury, Tony)
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Matthew Mark Gustafson and KSMG, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Matthew Mark Gustafson regarding Complaint #1 . (Atterbury, Tony)
June 15, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to KSMG, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Atterbury, Tony)
June 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Matthew Mark Gustafson, KSMG, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4654538), by Attorney Tony L. Atterbury on behalf of John Ballinger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Atterbury, Tony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballinger v. Gustafson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Ballinger
Represented By: Tony L. Atterbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mark Gustafson
Represented By: Joel E. Feistner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KSMG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?