Aloziem v. Wellpath LLC
Plaintiff: Anenye Aloziem
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv00265
Filed: July 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Per the email request of the parties, the Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline is extended to 10/6/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/6/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
August 2, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #9 for attorney Paige M. Lyle.Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
July 28, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4680733 by Attorney Paige M. Lyle on behalf of Defendant Wellpath, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Certificate of Good Standing)(Lyle, Paige)
July 28, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Mark E. Stamelos. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
July 28, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4680010 by Attorney Mark E. Stamelos on behalf of Defendant Wellpath, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Certificate of Good Standing)(Stamelos, Mark)
July 26, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Wellpath, LLC (Tesmer Paulson, Tara)
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Paige M. Lyle has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Mark E. Stamelos has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 21, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 21, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Wellpath Group Holdings, LLC (DE), Other Affiliate Jessamine Healthcare Inc., Other Affiliate Wellpath Holdings Inc. for Wellpath LLC. by Attorney Tara L. Tesmer Paulson on behalf of Defendants Wellpath LLC, Jessamine Healthcare Inc., Wellpath Group Holdings, LLC (DE), Wellpath Holdings Inc..(Tesmer Paulson, Tara)
July 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Anenye Aloziem from District Court of Douglas County, Case number CI 22-203 ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4675922) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Tara L. Tesmer Paulson on behalf of Wellpath LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Affidavit, #6 Exhibit)(Tesmer Paulson, Tara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aloziem v. Wellpath LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anenye Aloziem
Represented By: Julie A. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath, LLC
Represented By: Mark E. Stamelos
Represented By: Paige M. Lyle
Represented By: Tara L. Tesmer Paulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?