Hawley v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Adam Hawley
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2022cv00270
Filed: July 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2022 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Paul A. Banker on behalf of Plaintiff Adam Hawley.(Banker, Paul)
September 2, 2022 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney Sydney E. Richards on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(Richards, Sydney)
August 24, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TJM)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER- Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/23/2022.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (MKR)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Richards, Sydney)
August 5, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company on 8/2/2022. (Banker, Paul)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
July 28, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
July 28, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Union Pacific Railroad Company regarding Complaint, #1 . (Banker, Paul)
July 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4680304), by Attorney Paul A. Banker on behalf of Adam Hawley (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Banker, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawley v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Hawley
Represented By: Randal W. LeNeave
Represented By: Paul A. Banker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Sydney E. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?