McKesson Corporation v. Robert Moser, Inc.
Plaintiff: McKesson Corporation
Defendant: Robert Moser, Inc. doing business as Moser's U-Save Pharmacy
Case Number: 8:2022cv00322
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment against Robert Moser, Inc. d/b/a Moser's U-Save Pharmacy by Attorney Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of Plaintiff McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Pamela Craik, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Lally)(Lally, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2022 Filing 12 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Robert Moser, Inc. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO)
November 9, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Robert Moser, Inc. d/b/a Moser's U-Save Pharmacy by Attorney Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of Plaintiff McKesson Corporation.(Lally, Elizabeth)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - that plaintiff McKesson Corporation's November 1, 2022, Motion for Default Judgment, Filing #9 , is denied without prejudice to refiling after full compliance with NECivR 55.1. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LKO)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment against Robert Moser, Inc. d/b/a Moser's U-Save Pharmacy by Attorney Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of Plaintiff McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Pamela Craik, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Elizabeth Lally, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment)(Lally, Elizabeth)
October 10, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Robert Moser, Inc. on 9/20/2022. (Lally, Elizabeth)
September 29, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of Plaintiff McKesson Corporation.(Lally, Elizabeth)
September 15, 2022 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff McKesson Corporation. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TJM)
September 14, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Robert Moser, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
September 14, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Defendant, Robert Moser, Inc. d/b/a Moser's U-Save Pharmacy regarding Complaint, #1 . (Lally, Elizabeth)
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER that as a result of duplicate filing fees, the filing fee in the amount of $402.00 is refunded to the payor, Elizabeth M. Lally, receipt number ANEDC-4710652. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (DKM)
September 14, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Moser, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4710688), by Attorney Elizabeth M. Lally on behalf of McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Customer Application, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Invoice Summary, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Reclamation Letter)(Lally, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKesson Corporation v. Robert Moser, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Lally
Represented By: Tara Holterhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Moser, Inc. doing business as Moser's U-Save Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?