Lightfeather v. Lancaster County
Petitioner: Austin Edward Lightfeather
Respondent: Lancaster County
Case Number: 8:2022cv00350
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2022 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT filed on behalf of Petitioner Austin Edward Lightfeather.(MKR)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the Petitioner's #5 and #6 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The next step in this case is for the Court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The Court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to the MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #5 and MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #6 filed on behalf of Petitioner Austin Edward Lightfeather.(MKR)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Austin Edward Lightfeather.(MKR)
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Austin Edward Lightfeather.(MKR)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the Clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 11/18/2022: Check for MIFP or payment) Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO240 form)(MKR)
October 14, 2022 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 on behalf of Petitioner Austin Edward Lightfeather.(MKR)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (MKR)
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed on behalf ofAustin Edward Lightfeather. (MKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lightfeather v. Lancaster County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Austin Edward Lightfeather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lancaster County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?