U.S. Bank Equipment Finance v. Moxie Auto Sales, LLC et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Equipment Finance, a division of U.S. Bank National Association, a national banking association and U.S. Bank Equipmant Finance
Defendant: Moxie Auto Sales, LLC d/b/a Moxie Mitsubishi Auto Sales, a Nebraska limited liability company, Timothy Bunn and Moxie Auto Sales, LLC a Nebraska limited liability company doing business as Moxie Mitsubishi Auto Sales
Case Number: 8:2022cv00352
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Brian C Buescher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - This case is before the Court on individual defendant Timothy Bunn's Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Filing #9 . Pursuant to the Suggestion in Bankruptcy, further proceeds against defendant Bunn are stayed under 11 U.S.C. 362. Plaintiff and defendant Bunn are directed to file joint or separate status reports one-hundred-twenty (120) days from the date of this Order and every one-hundred-twenty (120) days thereafter. This case shall proceed as between remaining parties. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LKO)
November 17, 2022 Filing 9 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Attorney Trev E. Peterson on behalf of Defendant Timothy Bunn.(Peterson, Trev)
November 15, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Timothy Bunn on 11/12/2022. (Monroe, Emily)
October 19, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Moxie Auto Sales, LLC on 10/12/2022. (Monroe, Emily)
October 11, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to defendants Timothy Bunn and Moxie Auto Sales, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
October 11, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
October 7, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Timothy Bunn regarding Complaint, #1 . (Monroe, Emily)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Moxie Auto Sales, LLC d/b/a Moxie Mitsubishi Auto Sales regarding Complaint, #1 . (Monroe, Emily)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Emily N.K. Monroe on behalf of Plaintiff U.S. Bank Equipment Finance, a division of U.S. Bank National Association, a national banking association.(Monroe, Emily)
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4728006), by Attorney Emily N.K. Monroe on behalf of U.S. Bank Equipment Finance, a division of U.S. Bank National Association, a national banking association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Monroe, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Equipment Finance v. Moxie Auto Sales, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Equipment Finance, a division of U.S. Bank National Association, a national banking association
Represented By: Emily N.K. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Equipmant Finance
Represented By: Emily N.K. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moxie Auto Sales, LLC d/b/a Moxie Mitsubishi Auto Sales, a Nebraska limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moxie Auto Sales, LLC a Nebraska limited liability company doing business as Moxie Mitsubishi Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?