Larson v. BQ & Associates, P.C., L.L.O. et al
Plaintiff: Thor Larson
Defendant: Borsheim Jewelry Company, Inc., BQ & Associates, P.C., L.L.O. and Borsheims Fine Jewelry and Gifts
Case Number: 8:2022cv00385
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. All pending motions are denied as moot.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
December 27, 2022 Filing 17 Certificate of Compliance by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of Plaintiff Thor Larson.(Saathoff, Matthew)
December 23, 2022 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING Brief #15 . This filing does not contain a Certificate of Compliance as required by NECivR 7.1(d)(3). This notice is for your information for future filings.(MLF)
December 21, 2022 Filing 15 BRIEF in support of MOTION Enforce Settlement Agreement #13 by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of Plaintiff Thor Larson.(Saathoff, Matthew)
December 21, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION regarding MOTION Enforce Settlement Agreement #13 by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of Plaintiff Thor Larson.(Saathoff, Matthew)
December 21, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION Enforce Settlement Agreement by Attorney Matthew P. Saathoff on behalf of Plaintiff Thor Larson.(Saathoff, Matthew)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. #8 and #9 .The deadline for answering or responding to Plaintiff's complaint is stayed pending further order of the court.On or before December 21, 2022, Plaintiff shall file any motion to enforce the parties' settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Zwart, Cheryl)
December 6, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Borsheim Jewelry Company, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
December 6, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant BQ & Associates, P.C., L.L.O. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAB)
December 5, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Defendant Borsheim Jewelry Company, Inc..(Mitchell, Jason)
December 5, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jason R. Mitchell on behalf of Defendant BQ & Associates, P.C., L.L.O..(Mitchell, Jason)
November 23, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Howard Kaslow - Registered Agent defendant Borsheim Jewelry Company, Inc. on 11/15/2022. (Reinbrecht, William)
November 23, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Sonja Ernst - HR Manager defendant BQ & Associates, P.C., L.L.O. on 11/15/2022. (Reinbrecht, William)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants BQ & Associates, P.C., L.L.O. and Borsheim Jewelry Company, Inc. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
November 9, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Borsheim Jewlry Company, Inc., regarding Complaint #1 . (Car, Pamela)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to BQ & Associates PC LLO regarding Complaint #1 . (Car, Pamela)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4749560), by Attorney Pamela A. Car on behalf of Thor Larson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C _ county court pleadings)(Car, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. BQ & Associates, P.C., L.L.O. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borsheim Jewelry Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jason R. Mitchell
Represented By: Karl E. Von Oldenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BQ & Associates, P.C., L.L.O.
Represented By: Jason R. Mitchell
Represented By: Karl E. Von Oldenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borsheims Fine Jewelry and Gifts
Represented By: Jason R. Mitchell
Represented By: Karl E. Von Oldenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thor Larson
Represented By: Matthew P. Saathoff
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?