Lee v. Douglas County Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Damien Lee
Defendant: Douglas County Corrections and L. T. Dunning
Case Number: 8:2022cv00426
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2023 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Douglas County Correctional Center regarding Memorandum and Order #5 . Mail NOT RE-MAILED, inmate no longer there, unable to forward. (ADB)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : Plaintiff must update his address within 30 days. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without further notice to Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this order to the Douglas County Department of Corrections and to the Plaintiff's last known home address: 730 Harmony St, Council Bluffs, IA 51503. The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: February 17, 2023: check for address. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party as directed)(ADB) Modified on 1/19/2023 to reflect copies mailed(ADB).
January 3, 2023 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Damien Lee, 1428678, CJ-DOUGLAS, Douglas County Correctional Center, 710 South 17th Street Omaha, NE 68102 regarding Notice by Clerk (Pro Se Case) #2 , Order - Pro Se GO 2022-04, #3 . Mail not resent per envelope that inmate no longer here. (TCL)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
December 13, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (TCL)
December 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas County Corrections, L. T. Dunning. No Summons issued, filed on behalf of plaintiff Damien Lee. (TCL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Douglas County Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. T. Dunning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?