In the Matter of the Complaint of Derek Glen and Garrett Vanderheides
Defendant: N/A
Petitioner: Derek Glen and Garrett Vanderheides
Case Number: 8:2022cv00430
Filed: December 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Michael D Nelson
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #7 for attorney Christopher Harper. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
January 6, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4779696 by Attorney Christopher Harper on behalf of Petitioners Derek Glen and Garrett Vanderheides. (LKO)
January 5, 2023 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #5 for attorney Courtney C. Stirrat. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
January 5, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4779628 by Attorney Courtney C. Stirrat on behalf of Petitioner Derek Glen.(Stirrat, Courtney)
December 14, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Courtney C. Stirrat has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
December 14, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Christopher Harper has not registered for admittance to practice norregistered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
December 14, 2022 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
December 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against N/A ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4768023), by Attorney Joel E. Feistner on behalf of Derek Glen, Garrett Vanderheides(Feistner, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In the Matter of the Complaint of Derek Glen and Garrett Vanderheides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derek Glen
Represented By: Joel E. Feistner
Represented By: Christopher Harper
Represented By: Courtney C. Stirrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Garrett Vanderheides
Represented By: Joel E. Feistner
Represented By: Christopher Harper
Represented By: Courtney C. Stirrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N/A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?