Hill v. Gable
Petitioner: Teon D'mon Hill
Respondent: Craig Gable
Interested Party: Nebraska Attorney General
Case Number: 8:2023cv00013
Filed: January 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP, Filing No. #7 , is denied as moot. Petitioner's correspondence, Filing No. #8 , construed as a motion, is granted to the extent Petitioner's habeas petition will be reviewed and, if the petition proceeds, Petitioner will be given leave to file a brief in accordance with the Court's normal procedures in 2254 cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LRM)
February 6, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION on behalf of Petitioner Teon D'mon Hill. (LRM)
February 1, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Teon D'mon Hill. (LKO)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP, Filing No. #4 , is denied as moot. The next step in this case is for the Court to conduct a preliminary review of the habeas corpus petition in accordance with Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 cases. The Court will conduct this review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
January 23, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Teon D'mon Hill.(LKO)
January 23, 2023 TEXT ENTRY THAT FILING fee paid on behalf of TEON D'MON HILL on 01/23/2023. Receipt number 8065831, in the amount of $ 5.00. (JES)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Petitioner is directed to submit the $5.00 fee to the Clerk's office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to Petitioner the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The Clerk of the Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: February 21, 2023: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party with AO Form 240)(TCL)
January 13, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (ADB)
January 12, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by pro se petitioner Teon D'mon Hill. (ADB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Gable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teon D'mon Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Craig Gable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Nebraska Attorney General
Represented By: Douglas J. Peterson
Represented By: Michael T. Hilgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?