Goodwin v. Batallion
Plaintiff: Violet Goodwin
Defendant: Peter Batallion
Case Number: 8:2023cv00014
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT - PRO SE regarding Memorandum and Order #10 . This matter is dismissed without prejudice for the reasons discussed in the Memorandum and Order entered on this date. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
March 8, 2023 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - This case is dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Plaintiff's pending Motion for TRO and Injunction (Filing No. #9 ) is denied as moot.(MKR) Modified on 3/8/2023 to correct language (MKR).
February 28, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction on behalf of Plaintiff Violet Goodwin. (MKR)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Filing No. #7 ). Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
January 30, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Violet Goodwin.(MLF)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to submit the $402.00 fees to the Clerk's Office or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days. Failure to take either action will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240 ("Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit"). The Clerk of Court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: February 21, 2023: Check for MIFP or payment. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LKO)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Pursuant to the presiding judge's order of recusal (Filing No. #4 ), this case is reassigned to Chief District Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. for disposition and remains assigned to the pro se docket for judicial supervision. IT IS SO ORDERED. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MLF)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - This matter is before the court on the court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). SO ORDERED.Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER NO. 2022-04: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MLF)
January 17, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (MLF)
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peter Batallion. No Summons issued, filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Violet Goodwin. (MLF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. Batallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Batallion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?