Golftec Intellectual Property, LLC et al v. Porterfield, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Golftec Intellectual Property, LLC, Golftec Franchising, LP, Golftec Enterprises, LLC and Golftec Franchising, LLC
Defendant: Porterfield, LLC doing business as G Fairways and G Fairways Nebraska, LLC
Case Number: 8:2023cv00110
Filed: March 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER - Upon the request of counsel, this matter is stayed until June 8, 2023 pending finalization of settlement discussions. The parties shall file dismissal papers or a report advising as to the status of this action by June 8, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
April 7, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Plaintiffs Golftec Intellectual Property, LLC, Golftec Enterprises, LLC, Golftec Franchising, LLC, Golftec Franchising, LP.(Buter, Victoria)
April 7, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Golftec Franchising, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
April 7, 2023 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant G Fairways Nebraska, LLC, Porterfield, LLC, by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Golftec Intellectual Property, LLC, Golftec Enterprises, LLC, Golftec Franchising, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buter, Victoria)
April 6, 2023 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant G Fairways Nebraska, LLC on 3/31/2023. (Buter, Victoria)
April 6, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Porterfield, LLC on 3/31/2023. (Buter, Victoria)
March 28, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to defendants G Fairways Nebraska, LLC and Porterfield, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
March 28, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Requested as to Porterfield, LLC d/b/a G Fairways regarding Complaint, #1 . (Attachments: #1 1 - Complaint)(Buter, Victoria)
March 28, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Requested as to G Fairways Nebraska LLC regarding Complaint, #1 . (Attachments: #1 1 - Complaint)(Buter, Victoria)
March 24, 2023 Filing 9 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Lee F. Johnston has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
March 24, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Robert Ziemian has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
March 24, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Ian R. Rainey has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (JES)
March 24, 2023 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Golftec Franchising, LP. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JES)
March 24, 2023 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Golftec Enterprises, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JES)
March 24, 2023 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Golftec Intellectual Property, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JES)
March 24, 2023 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a Trademark. Complaint filed on 3/24/2023. Notification sent to the U.S. Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JES)
March 24, 2023 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
March 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against G Fairways Nebraska, LLC, Porterfield, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4828421), by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of GOLFTEC Intellectual Property, LLC, GOLFTEC ENTERPRISES, LLC, GOLFTEC Franchising LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buter, Victoria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golftec Intellectual Property, LLC et al v. Porterfield, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golftec Intellectual Property, LLC
Represented By: Ian R. Rainey
Represented By: Lee F. Johnston
Represented By: Robert Ziemian
Represented By: Thomas H. Dahlk
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Represented By: Robert P. Ziemian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golftec Franchising, LP
Represented By: Ian R. Rainey
Represented By: Thomas H. Dahlk
Represented By: Lee F. Johnston
Represented By: Robert Ziemian
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Represented By: Robert P. Ziemian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golftec Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Ian R. Rainey
Represented By: Lee F. Johnston
Represented By: Robert Ziemian
Represented By: Thomas H. Dahlk
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Represented By: Robert P. Ziemian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golftec Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Victoria H. Buter
Represented By: Ian R. Rainey
Represented By: Lee F. Johnston
Represented By: Robert P. Ziemian
Represented By: Thomas H. Dahlk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porterfield, LLC doing business as G Fairways
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Fairways Nebraska, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?