Griffin v. Meyers
Petitioner: Arthur James Griffin, Jr.
Respondent: Micheal Meyers
Case Number: 8:2023cv00491
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Pro Se Docket
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Petitioner Arthur James Griffin, Jr. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LRM)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (LRM)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LRM)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Petitioner Arthur James Griffin, Jr. (LRM)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Arthur James Griffin, Jr.(LRM) Modified on 11/9/2023 to correct filing date (LRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur James Griffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Micheal Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?