Fitlife Brands, Inc. v. 1928 Wings LLC
Plaintiff: Fitlife Brands, Inc.
Defendant: 1928 Wings LLC doing business as Amplicell
Case Number: 8:2024cv00120
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant 1928 Wings LLC on 5/15/2024. (Holst, Luke)
May 8, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to defendant 1928 Wings LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Requested as to 1928 Wings LLC d/b/a Amplicell regarding Complaint #1 . (Holst, Luke)
May 1, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Fitlife Brands, Inc. for Fitlife Brands, Inc.. by Attorney Luke C. Holst on behalf of Plaintiffs Fitlife Brands, Inc., Fitlife Brands, Inc..(Holst, Luke)
April 4, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a trademark. Complaint filed on 4/4/24. Notification sent to the U.S. Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JES)
April 4, 2024 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Fitlife Brands, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (JES)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against 1928 Wings LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5062758), by Attorney Luke C. Holst on behalf of Fitlife Brands, Inc.(Holst, Luke)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitlife Brands, Inc. v. 1928 Wings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitlife Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Luke C. Holst
Represented By: Brian T. McKernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1928 Wings LLC doing business as Amplicell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?