National Legal and Policy Center et al v. Berkshire Hathaway Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Legal and Policy Center, Peter T. Flaherty and James R. Tovar
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Warren Buffett, John Doe 1 and John Doe 2
Case Number: 8:2024cv00162
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Jacqueline M DeLuca
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 22 INDEX in support of MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc., and Warren Buffett #20 by Attorney Tara A. Stingley on behalf of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Warren Buffett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Stingley, Tara)
June 28, 2024 Filing 21 BRIEF in support of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc. and Warren Buffett's Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Tara A. Stingley on behalf of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Warren Buffett.(Stingley, Tara)
June 28, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc., and Warren Buffett by Attorney Tara A. Stingley on behalf of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Warren Buffett.(Stingley, Tara)
May 24, 2024 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #14 for attorney Bryce Friedman. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 24, 2024 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #13 for attorney Meredith Karp. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
May 24, 2024 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Thomas J. Monaghan on behalf of Plaintiff James R. Tovar.(Monaghan, Thomas)
May 24, 2024 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Thomas J. Monaghan on behalf of Plaintiff Peter T. Flaherty.(Monaghan, Thomas)
May 24, 2024 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Thomas J. Monaghan on behalf of Plaintiff National Legal and Policy Center.(Monaghan, Thomas)
May 24, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5096001 by Attorney Bryce Friedman on behalf of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Warren Buffett.(Friedman, Bryce)
May 24, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5095998 by Attorney Meredith Karp on behalf of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Warren Buffett.(Karp, Meredith)
May 23, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Isaiah J Frohling on behalf of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Warren Buffett (Frohling, Isaiah)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc. and Warren Buffett shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before June 28, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TMM)
May 22, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Tara A. Stingley on behalf of Defendant Warren Buffett.(Stingley, Tara)
May 22, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Tara A. Stingley on behalf of Defendant Berkshire Hathaway Inc..(Stingley, Tara)
May 22, 2024 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Tara A. Stingley on behalf of Defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Warren Buffett.(Stingley, Tara)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Warren Buffett on 5/8/2024. (Monaghan, Thomas)
May 13, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Berkshire Hathaway Inc. on 5/8/2024. (Monaghan, Thomas)
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Berkshire Hathaway Inc. and Warren Buffett. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Warren Buffett regarding Complaint #1 . (Monaghan, Thomas)
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Berkshire Hathway, Inc. regarding Complaint #1 . (Monaghan, Thomas)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5083820), by Attorney Thomas J. Monaghan on behalf of National Legal and Policy Center(Monaghan, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Legal and Policy Center et al v. Berkshire Hathaway Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Legal and Policy Center
Represented By: Stuart J. Dornan
Represented By: Thomas J. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter T. Flaherty
Represented By: Stuart J. Dornan
Represented By: Thomas J. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Tovar
Represented By: Stuart J. Dornan
Represented By: Thomas J. Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Inc.
Represented By: Bryce Friedman
Represented By: Meredith Karp
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Represented By: Isaiah J Frohling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Buffett
Represented By: Bryce Friedman
Represented By: Meredith Karp
Represented By: Tara A. Stingley
Represented By: Isaiah J Frohling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?