Connors v. Velocity Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Adam Connors
Defendant: Gurstel Law Firm, PC and Velocity Investments, LLC
Case Number: 8:2024cv00407
Filed: October 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Jacqueline M DeLuca
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS - WebEx. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LKO)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 1/13/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LKO)
December 10, 2024 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Velocity Portfolio Group, Inc. for Velocity Investments, LLC. by Attorney Patrick D. Newman on behalf of Defendants Velocity Investments, LLC, Velocity Portfolio Group, Inc..(Newman, Patrick)
December 10, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Velocity Investments, LLC (Newman, Patrick)
December 10, 2024 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Patrick D. Newman on behalf of Defendant Gurstel Law Firm, PC.(Newman, Patrick)
December 10, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Gurstel Law Firm, PC (Newman, Patrick)
December 3, 2024 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Gurstel Law Firm, PC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MPM)
December 3, 2024 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Velocity Investments, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MPM)
December 2, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Patrick D. Newman on behalf of Defendants Velocity Investments, LLC, Gurstel Law Firm, PC (Newman, Patrick)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Stipulation. Defendants shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before December 10, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TMM)
November 18, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION regarding Complaint #1 to Extend Time to Answer Complaint to December 10, 2024 by Attorney Patrick D. Newman on behalf of Defendant Gurstel Law Firm, PC.(Newman, Patrick)
November 11, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Gurstel Law Firm, PC on 10/29/2024. (Reinbrecht, William)
November 11, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Velocity Investments, LLC on 11/1/2024. (Reinbrecht, William)
October 21, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants Gurstel Law Firm, PC, Velocity Investments, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (JES)
October 21, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Requested as to Gurstel Law Firm, PC regarding Complaint #1 . (Car, Pamela)
October 21, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Velocity Investments, LLC regarding Complaint #1 . (Car, Pamela)
October 18, 2024 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (JES)
October 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5183105), by Attorney Pamela A. Car on behalf of Adam Connors (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Car, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connors v. Velocity Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Connors
Represented By: William L. Reinbrecht
Represented By: Pamela A. Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurstel Law Firm, PC
Represented By: Patrick D. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Investments, LLC
Represented By: Patrick D. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?