Jones v. Zander Group Holdings, Inc et al
Plaintiff: William H. Jones, II
Defendant: Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Shervin Eftekhari, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Insurance Agency, Joshua Vollet, Elizabeth Collins, John Does 1-8, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership doing business as Zander Insurance Group, John Does 4-8 and Jeffrey J. Zander
Interested Party: McGrath North Mullin & Kratz, PC LLO
Case Number: 8:2024cv00428
Filed: November 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER The motion to withdraw as counsel of record (Filing No. #34 ) is granted and Shaun A. Gates and Mark A. Stamelos are deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendants in this case and the show cause deadline is terminated. The Clerk of Court shall terminate electronic notice to Shaun A. Gates and Mark A. Stamelos in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
December 17, 2024 Filing 34 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Lars C. Golumbic on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shaun A. Gates)(Golumbic, Lars)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE On or before January 3, 2025, the attorneys listed above shall either comply with the requests set forth in the letters from the Clerk of the Court or show cause by written affidavit why they cannot comply with the rules of the Court. Failure to comply with this order will result in Mark E. Stamelos and/or Shaun A. Gates being removed as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copies mailed to unregistered party) (LRM)
November 26, 2024 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Patrick D. Pepper on behalf of Interested Party McGrath North Mullin & Kratz, PC LLO.(Pepper, Patrick)
November 18, 2024 Filing 31 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Quash #20 by Attorney Lars C. Golumbic on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency.(Golumbic, Lars)
November 18, 2024 Filing 30 RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5192834) #1 by Attorney Lars C. Golumbic on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Declaration of Lars Golumbic)(Golumbic, Lars)
November 18, 2024 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 - JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership by Attorney Sarah M. Adams on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency.(Adams, Sarah)
November 18, 2024 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 - Zander Insurance Agency by Attorney Sarah M. Adams on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency.(Adams, Sarah)
November 18, 2024 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 - Zander Group Holdings Inc. 401k Plan by Attorney Sarah M. Adams on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency.(Adams, Sarah)
November 18, 2024 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 - Zander Group Holdings Inc. ESOP by Attorney Sarah M. Adams on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency.(Adams, Sarah)
November 18, 2024 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 - Zander Group Holdings Inc. by Attorney Sarah M. Adams on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency.(Adams, Sarah)
November 15, 2024 Filing 24 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Interested Party McGrath North Mullin & Kratz, PC LLO. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
November 15, 2024 Filing 23 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Zander Insurance Agency. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
November 15, 2024 Filing 22 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
November 14, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance of James G. Powers and Patrick D. Pepper by Attorney Patrick D. Pepper on behalf of Interested Party McGrath North Mullin & Kratz, PC LLO (Pepper, Patrick)
November 14, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Quash by Attorney Seamus T. Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff William H. Jones, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: McGrath 30b6 Subpoena, #2 Exhibit 2: Langdon Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 3: Cannon Subpoena)(Kelly, Seamus)
November 13, 2024 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #16 for attorney Lawrence A. Brett. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 13, 2024 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #15 for attorney Sarah M. Adams. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 13, 2024 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #14 for attorney Lars Golumbic. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS)
November 8, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5196109 by Attorney Lawrence A. Brett on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency.(Brett, Lawrence)
November 8, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5196099 by Attorney Sarah M. Adams on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency.(Adams, Sarah)
November 8, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5196081 by Attorney Lars C. Golumbic on behalf of Defendants Joshua Vollet, Shervin Eftekhari, Elizabeth Collins, Steven James, Zander Group Holdings, Inc, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,, Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Jeffrey J. Zander, JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership, Zander Insurance Agency.(Golumbic, Lars)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - Pursuant to the presiding judge's order of recusal (Filing No. #12 ), this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Bataillon for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MKR)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL-REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT- This matter is before the court on the Court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), which states: "Any... judge... of the United States shall disqualify himself inany proceeding in which his impartiality might reasonably be questioned." Upon review of the parties and the record in the above-designated case, the undersigned judge shall, and hereby does, recuse himself from the above-designated case pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a). Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (MKR)
November 5, 2024 Filing 11 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
November 5, 2024 Filing 10 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
November 5, 2024 Filing 9 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO)
November 5, 2024 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Shaun A. Gates has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
November 5, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Lawrence A. Brett has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
November 5, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Sarah M. Adams has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
November 5, 2024 Filing 5 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Mark E. Stamelos has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
November 5, 2024 Filing 4 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Lars C. Golumic has not registered for admittance to practice. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
November 5, 2024 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
November 4, 2024 Filing 2 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5192834) #1 by Attorney Seamus T. Kelly on behalf of Plaintiff William H Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Vollet Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 3 Cover Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 Cannon Emails, #5 Exhibit 5 Langdon Email, #6 Exhibit 6 SK Declaration)(Kelly, Seamus)
November 4, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Third Party Subpoena ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5192834), by Attorney Seamus T. Kelly on behalf of William H Jones(Kelly, Seamus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Zander Group Holdings, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zander Group Holdings, Inc. 401(k) Plan
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven James
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zander Group Holdings, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan,
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shervin Eftekhari
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zander Group Holdings, Inc
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zander Insurance Agency
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Vollet
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Collins
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-8
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JJZ Insurance Agency Partnership doing business as Zander Insurance Group
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 4-8
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey J. Zander
Represented By: Sarah M. Adams
Represented By: Lawrence A. Brett
Represented By: Lars C. Golumbic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William H. Jones, II
Represented By: Seamus T. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: McGrath North Mullin & Kratz, PC LLO
Represented By: Patrick D. Pepper
Represented By: James G. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?