Blecha v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Michael Blecha
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 8:2025cv00093
Filed: February 14, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Jacqueline M DeLuca
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The operative complaint is Plaintiff's Amended Complaint at Filing No. #11 . Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint on or before April 25, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (KLM)
April 10, 2025 Filing 13 Certificate of Service - Disclosures by Attorney Joseph D. Hall on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Blecha.(Hall, Joseph)
April 10, 2025 Filing 12 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Attorney Joseph D. Hall on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Blecha. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint (filed on 4.1.25))(Hall, Joseph)
April 1, 2025 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company, by Attorney Joseph D. Hall on behalf of Michael Blecha(Hall, Joseph)
March 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TCL)
March 20, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due February 13, 2026. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 10, 2026 at 9:00 a.m. by telephone. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (TCL)
March 18, 2025 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting JOINT REPORT OF PARTIES' by Attorney Joseph D. Hall on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Blecha.(Hall, Joseph)
February 26, 2025 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Union Pacific Corporation for Union Pacific Railroad Company. by Attorney Nicholas B. McGrath on behalf of Defendants Union Pacific Railroad Company, Union Pacific Corporation.(McGrath, Nicholas)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER - WebEx. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 3/18/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (JES)
February 18, 2025 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 Amended Exhibit A by Attorney Nicholas B. McGrath on behalf of Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company.(McGrath, Nicholas)
February 14, 2025 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(RMR)
February 14, 2025 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (RMR)
February 14, 2025 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Union Pacific Railroad Company from DISTRICT COURT FOR DOUGLAS COUNTY, NEBRASKA, Case number CI 24-10004 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5257760) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Nicholas B. McGrath on behalf of Union Pacific Railroad Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state court docket)(McGrath, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blecha v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Blecha
Represented By: Joseph D. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Nicholas B. McGrath
Represented By: Michaelle L. Baumert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?