ACF FINCO I LP v. KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.
Plaintiff: ACF FINCO I LP
Defendant: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022ap01088
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: MIKE K NAKAGAWA
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Service Executed on KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. 6/7/2022 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (Related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP, #5 Summons Issued.) (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued on KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. (mmm)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/13/2022 at 10:00 AM at Remote. (Related document(s)#1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff ACF FINCO I LP.) (mmm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 3 Request to Issue Summons On: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.. Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Ownership Statement Plaintiff ACF FinCo I LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Corporate parents added to case: Ares Holdings L.P., a Delaware entity.Corporate Affiliates added to case:, ACF FinCo GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate GP LLC, a Delaware entity, ACF Intermediate Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance GP LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Commercial Finance LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Corporation, a Delaware entity, Ares Management Holdings LP, a Delaware entity, Ares Management LLC, a Delaware entity Plaintiff ACF FinCo I LP's Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7007.1 and LR 7007.1 Filed by TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI on behalf of ACF FINCO I LP (GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 Adversary case 22-01088. Complaint COMPLAINT TO AVOID AND RECOVER PREFERENTIAL TRANSFERS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. SECTIONS 547 AND 550 Filed by ACF FINCO I LP vs. KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(GRAY KOZLOWSKI, TALITHA)
May 27, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint(# 22-01088-mkn) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A20688895, fee amount $ 350.00.(re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: ACF FINCO I LP v. KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACF FINCO I LP
Represented By: TALITHA B. GRAY KOZLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?