FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC
Debtor: FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC
Trustee: CHAPTER 11 - LV
Us Trustee: U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
Not Classified By Court: STRETTO and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Case Number: 2:2022bk11824
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: AUGUST B LANDIS
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 290 Response to Status Report with Certificate of Service Filed by NICOLE E. LOVELOCK on behalf of Robert W Dziubla, LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#286 Status Report filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (LOVELOCK, NICOLE)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#269 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (cly)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#250 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (cly)
July 21, 2022 Filing 287 Certificate of Service of Status Report for July 25, 2022 Hearing Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#286 Status Report filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 21, 2022 Filing 286 Status Report (Chapter 11) (for July 25, 2022 Hearing) Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 21, 2022 Filing 285 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 06/30/2022 Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signature #2 Exhibit Financials) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 21, 2022 Filing 284 Designation of Local Counsel Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER, Jessica L Bagdanov on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#250 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (GUBNER, STEVEN)
July 21, 2022 Filing 283 Designation of Local Counsel Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER, Jason B. Komorsky on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#269 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (GUBNER, STEVEN)
July 20, 2022 Filing 282 Request for Special Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by PHILIP S. GERSON on behalf of M2 EPC dba M2 ENGINEERING PROCUREMENT AND CONSTRUCTION (GERSON, PHILIP)
July 18, 2022 Filing 281 Reply with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#211 Motion to Appoint Examiner filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN). Modified on 7/19/2022 to remove relationship to doc #254 and doc #255 (Carruth, NP).
July 18, 2022 Filing 280 Reply with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#206 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 #6 Exhibit 6 #7 Exhibit 7 #8 Exhibit 8 #9 Exhibit 9 #10 Exhibit 10 #11 Exhibit 11 #12 Exhibit 12 #13 Exhibit 13 #14 Exhibit 14 - Part 1 #15 Exhibit 14 - Part 2 #16 Exhibit 15 #17 Exhibit 16 #18 Exhibit 17 #19 Exhibit 18 #20 Exhibit 19) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
July 18, 2022 Filing 279 Reply Debtor's Reply to the United States Trustee's Objection to Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall as Accountant with Certificate of Service Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#263 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 18, 2022 Filing 278 Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoenas with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (GUBNER, STEVEN)
July 18, 2022 Filing 277 Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 9/1/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (Related document(s)#271 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (cly)
July 15, 2022 Filing 276 Certificate of Service re: Debtors Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Dated July 15, 2022 (Docket No. 270), Disclosure Statement Describing Debtors Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Dated July 15, 2022 (Docket No. 271), and Notice of Hearing on Debtors Disclosure Statement Describing Debtors Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Dated July 15, 2022 (Docket No. 275) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#270 Chapter 11 Plan #1 filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #271 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #275 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
July 15, 2022 Filing 275 Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Disclosure Statement Describing Debtor's Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Dated July 14, 2022 Hearing Date: 09/01/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#271 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 15, 2022 Filing 274 Notice Notice of Intent to Issue Subpoenas with Proof of Service with Certificate of Service Filed by JESSICA S. WELLINGTON on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (WELLINGTON, JESSICA)
July 15, 2022 Filing 273 Supplemental Certificate of Service re: Official Form 309F1 (for Corporations or Partnerships) Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 86), Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claims (attached hereto as Exhibit A), Official Form 410 Proof of Claim (attached hereto as Exhibit B), Official Form 410 Instructions for Proof of Claim (attached hereto as Exhibit C), and Procedures for Providing Noticing in the Chapter 11 Case (attached hereto as Exhibit D) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#86 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) (STRETTO)
July 15, 2022 Filing 272 Certificate of Service Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#270 Chapter 11 Plan #1 filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #271 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 15, 2022 Filing 271 Disclosure Statement Describing Debtor's Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Dated July 15, 2022 Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 15, 2022 Filing 270 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization #1 Debtor's Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Dated July 15, 2022 Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #265) (cly)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #264) (cly)
July 15, 2022 Filing 266 Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#263 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11) (DIDION, TERRI)
July 14, 2022 Filing 269 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Receipt Number 242935 Fee Amount $250. Filed by JASON B. KOMORSKY on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (mar)
July 14, 2022 Filing 265 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination of Dianne Meacher Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 with Certificate of Service Filed by JESSICA S. WELLINGTON on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (WELLINGTON, JESSICA)
July 14, 2022 Filing 264 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination of Michael Meacher Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 with Certificate of Service Filed by JESSICA S. WELLINGTON on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (WELLINGTON, JESSICA)
July 14, 2022 Filing 263 Objection and Reservation of Rights of U.S. Trustee to Debtor's Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall as Accountant Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(a), 328(a), and 330 Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#200 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (DIDION, TERRI)
July 14, 2022 Filing 262 Response and Reservation of Rights of FS DIP, LLC to Pending Matters with Certificate of Service Filed by SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ on behalf of FS DIP, LLC (Related document(s)#202 Motion for Approval of Procedures filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #206 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #211 Motion to Appoint Examiner filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC.) (SCHWARTZ, SAMUEL)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #246) (cly)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #245) (cly)
July 13, 2022 Filing 259 Declaration Of: Sameh Attia in Support of the Debtor's Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall as Accountant with Certificate of Service Filed by JESSICA S. WELLINGTON on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#200 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (WELLINGTON, JESSICA)
July 12, 2022 Filing 258 Certificate of Service re: Debtors Opposition to Las Vegas Development Fund, LLCs, Motion to Terminate Stay (Docket No. 253), Debtors Opposition to Las Vegas Development Fund, LLCs Motion for the Appointment of an Examiner (Docket No. 254), Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to the Motion of Las Vegas Development Fund, LLC to Appoint an Examiner (Docket No. 255), and The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (1) Opposition to Motion to Terminate Stay; and (2) Joinder to Debtors Opposition to Motion to Terminate Stay (Docket No. 256) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#253 Opposition filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #254 Opposition filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #255 Objection filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #256 Opposition filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (STRETTO)
July 11, 2022 Filing 257 Opposition Joinder to Debtor's Opposition to Las Vegas Development Fund, LLC's Motion to Terminate Stay Filed by TERESA M. PILATOWICZ on behalf of VNV DYNASTY TRUST II, VNV DYNASTY TRUST I, IGNATIUS PIAZZA, JENNIFER PIAZZA (Related document(s)#253 Opposition filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (PILATOWICZ, TERESA) Modified on 7/12/2022 to relate to doc #253 in place of doc #206 (Carruth, NP).
July 11, 2022 Filing 256 Opposition to Motion to Terminate Stay; and (2) Joinder to Debtor's Opposition to Motion to Terminate Stay Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#206 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #253 Opposition filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (CICA, DAWN)
July 11, 2022 Filing 255 Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to the Motion of Las Vegas Development Fund, LLC to Appoint an Examiner Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#211 Motion to Appoint Examiner filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC.) (CICA, DAWN)
July 11, 2022 Filing 254 Opposition Debtor's Opposition to Las Vegas Development Fund, LLC's Motion for the Appointment of an Examiner Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#211 Motion to Appoint Examiner filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 11, 2022 Filing 253 Opposition Debtor's Opposition to Las Vegas Development Fund, LLC's Motion to Terminate Stay Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#206 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
July 11, 2022 Filing 252 Qualified Opposition with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#202 Motion for Approval of Procedures filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
July 11, 2022 Filing 251 Certificate of Service Filed by U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#249 Response filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11) (DIDION, TERRI)
July 11, 2022 Filing 249 Response and Reservation of Rights of U.S. Trustee to Debtor's Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall as Accountant Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec. 327(a), 328(a), and 330 Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#200 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (DIDION, TERRI)
July 8, 2022 Filing 250 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Receipt Number 242910 Fee Amount $250. Filed by JESSICA L. BAGDANOV on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (mar)
July 8, 2022 Filing 248 Supplemental Certificate of Service re: Official Form 309F1 (for Corporations or Partnerships) Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 86) with Certificate of Service Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#86 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) (STRETTO)
July 7, 2022 Filing 247 BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf (Related document(s)#241 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-BK)) No. of Notices: 3055. Notice Date 07/07/2022. (Admin.)
July 7, 2022 Filing 246 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination of Robert Dziubla Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (GUBNER, STEVEN)
July 7, 2022 Filing 245 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination of Person(s) Most Knowledgeable for Las Vegas Development Fund, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 with Certificate of Service Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (GUBNER, STEVEN)
July 6, 2022 Filing 244 Certificate of Service Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#228 Order, #230 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #231 Declaration filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #232 Declaration filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #233 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #234 Declaration filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #235 Declaration filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #236 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #237 Declaration filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #238 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #239 Declaration filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #240 Attorney Information Sheet filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #242 Order on Motion for Order Shortening Time, #243 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (STRETTO)
July 5, 2022 Filing 243 Notice of Entry of Order Granting Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Hear Employment Applications on the July 25th Omnibus Hearing Date and Notice of Hearing with Certificate of Service Filed by TRACY M. O'STEEN on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#242 Order on Motion for Order Shortening Time) (O'STEEN, TRACY)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time (Related document(s) #238). Hearing scheduled 7/25/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (Related document(s)#230 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #233 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #236 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors.) (cly)
July 1, 2022 Filing 241 Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 229 . (admin)
July 1, 2022 Filing 240 Attorney Information Sheet with Certificate of Service Filed by TRACY M. O'STEEN on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#238 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (O'STEEN, TRACY)
July 1, 2022 Filing 239 Declaration Of: Tracy M. O'Steen, Esq. with Certificate of Service Filed by TRACY M. O'STEEN on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#238 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (O'STEEN, TRACY)
July 1, 2022 Filing 238 Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time to Hear Employment Applications on the July 25th Omnibus Hearing Date Filed by TRACY M. O'STEEN on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#230 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors,#233 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors,#236 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors)(O'STEEN, TRACY). Modified on 7/5/2022 to remove relationship to docs #231,232,234,235,237 (Hannan, KS).
July 1, 2022 Filing 237 Declaration Of: Matthew Dundon Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#236 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (CICA, DAWN)
July 1, 2022 Filing 236 Application to Employ Dundon Advisers LLC as Financial Advisor with Proposed Order Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (CICA, DAWN) Modified on 7/5/2022 to reflect no proposed order attached (Hannan, KS).
July 1, 2022 Filing 235 Declaration Of: Mark Eagleton Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#233 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (CICA, DAWN)
July 1, 2022 Filing 234 Declaration Of: Robert L. LeHane, Esq. Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#233 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (CICA, DAWN)
July 1, 2022 Filing 233 Application to Employ Kelley Drye & Warren LLP as Lead Counsel with Proposed Order Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (CICA, DAWN)
July 1, 2022 Filing 232 Declaration Of: Mark Eagleton Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#230 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (CICA, DAWN)
July 1, 2022 Filing 231 Declaration Of: Dawn M. Cica, Esq. Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#230 Application to Employ filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (CICA, DAWN)
July 1, 2022 Filing 230 Application to Employ Carlyon Cica Chtd. as Nevada Counsel with Proposed Order with Certificate of Service Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (CICA, DAWN)
July 1, 2022 Filing 229 Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 06/28/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number (855) 873-2223. Purchasing Party: Jessica Studley. Redaction Request Due By 07/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 08/1/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 09/29/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
July 1, 2022 Filing 228 Final Order: (I) Authorizing Debtor To Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Granting Liens And Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing Debtor's Use Of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying The Automatic Stay, And (V) Granting Other Related Relief (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (mmm)
July 1, 2022 Filing 227 Supplemental Certificate of Service re: Order Granting Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order: (1) Authorizing but not Requiring, Debtor to Pay or Honor (A) Prepetition Wages, Salaries, and Other Compensation Including Reimbursement of Expenses and (B) Prepetition Medical, Workers Compensation, Paid Time Off, and Similar Benefits; and (2) Authorizing and Directing Applicable Banks and Other Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Presented for Payment and to Honor Fund Transfer Requests (Docket No. 50), Notice of Telephonic Section 341 Meeting (Docket No. 58), Interim Order on Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders: (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens and Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing the Debtors Use of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 59), Debtors Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 60), Declarations of Paul Huygens in Support of Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 61), and Official Form 309F1: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 86) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#50 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #58 Notice filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11, #59 Order, #60 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #61 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #86 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) (STRETTO)
July 1, 2022 Filing 226 Certificate of Service Filed by NICOLE E. LOVELOCK on behalf of Robert W Dziubla, EB5 Impact Advisors, LLC, EB5 Impact Capital Regional Center, LLC, Jon Fleming, LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, Linda Stanwood (LOVELOCK, NICOLE)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Order Granting Application to Employ (Related document(s) #60) (cly)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Order Granting Application to Employ (Related document(s) #42) (cly)
June 29, 2022 Filing 223 Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#218 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #219 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 29, 2022 Filing 222 Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#218 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #219 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 28, 2022 Filing 221 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by NICOLE E. LOVELOCK on behalf of Linda Stanwood, Jon Fleming, Robert W Dziubla, EB5 Impact Advisors, LLC, EB5 Impact Capital Regional Center, LLC, LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (LOVELOCK, NICOLE)
June 28, 2022 Filing 220 Certificate of Service re: Debtors Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall as Accountant Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a), 328(a) and 330 Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 200), Declaration of Leslie Sobol in Support of the Debtors Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall as Accountant Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a), 328(a) and 330 Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 201), Debtors Motion for Entry of Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals (Docket No. 202), Declaration of Ignatius Piazza in Support of Debtors Motion for Entry of Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals (Docket No. 203), Notice of Hearing on Debtors Motion for Entry of Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals (Docket No. 204), and Notice of Hearing on Debtors Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall as Accountant Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a), 328(a) and 330 Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 205) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#200 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #201 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #202 Motion for Approval of Procedures filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #203 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #204 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #205 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
June 28, 2022 Filing 219 Amended Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 07/25/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 A.M. Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s) #211 Motion to Appoint Examiner filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN). Modified on 6/29/2022 to relate doc #211 in place of doc #212 (Carruth, NP).
June 28, 2022 Filing 218 Amended Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 07/25/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 A.M. Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#206 Motion for Relief from Stay Property: TO PROCEED IN STATE COURT LITIGATION IN CONJUNCTION WITH MOTION TO REMAND Fee Amount $188. filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/29/2022 to relate doc #206 in place of doc #209 (Carruth, NP).
June 28, 2022 Filing 217 Notice of Docketing Error (Related document(s)#209 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #212 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (cly)
June 28, 2022 Filing 216 Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 7/25/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (Related document(s)#200 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #202 Motion for Approval of Procedures filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #206 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #211 Motion to Appoint Examiner filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (cly)
June 28, 2022 Filing 215 Certificate of Service re: Official Form 309F1 (for Corporations or Partnerships) Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 86), Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claims (attached hereto as Exhibit A), Official Form 410 Proof of Claim (attached hereto as Exhibit B), and Official Form 410 Instructions for Proof of Claim (attached hereto as Exhibit C) with Certificate of Service Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#86 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) (STRETTO)
June 28, 2022 Filing 214 Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#209 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #212 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 213 Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#211 Motion to Appoint Examiner filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #212 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 212 Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 07/25/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 A.M. Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#211 Motion to Appoint Examiner filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 211 Motion to Appoint Examiner Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 210 Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#206 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #207 Declaration filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #208 Declaration filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #209 Notice of Hearing filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 209 Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 07/25/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 A.M. Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#206 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 208 Declaration Of: BRIAN D. SHAPIRO Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#206 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 207 Declaration Of: ANDREA CHAMPION Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#206 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 206 Motion for Relief from Stay Property: TO PROCEED IN STATE COURT LITIGATION IN CONJUNCTION WITH MOTION TO REMAND Fee Amount $188. Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 #6 Exhibit 6 #7 Exhibit 7 #8 Exhibit 8)(SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 205 Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall as Accountant Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a), 328 and 330 Effective as of the Petition Date Hearing Date: 07/25/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#200 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 204 Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Motion for Entry of Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals Hearing Date: 07/25/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#202 Motion for Approval of Procedures filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 203 Declaration Of: Ignatius Piazza Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#202 Motion for Approval of Procedures filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 202 Motion for Approval of Procedures Debtor's Motion for Entry of Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals with Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 201 Declaration Of: Leslie Sobol Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#200 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 200 Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall as Accountant Application to Employ Lucas Horsfall, LLC as Accountant Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a), 328(a) and 330 Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 27, 2022 Filing 199 Minute Entry Re: hearing on 6/27/2022 9:30 AM. Hearing Off Calendar/ Staus Concluded (related document(s): #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (anm)
June 27, 2022 Filing 198 Minute Entry Re: hearing on 6/27/2022 9:30 AM. Continued. (related document(s): #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) Appearances: JASON R. ADAMS, DAWN M. CICA, STEVEN T GUBNER, SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ, SUSAN K. SEFLIN, MATTHEW J. STOCKL (Continued Oral Ruling scheduled 06/28/2022 at 03:00 PM at Remote. (anm)
June 27, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Motion for Relief from Stay(# 22-11824-abl) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 188.00). Receipt number A20727445, fee amount $ 188.00.(re: Doc#206) (U.S. Treasury)
June 26, 2022 Filing 197 BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#191 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.)
June 26, 2022 Filing 196 BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#190 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.)
June 25, 2022 Filing 195 BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#177 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/25/2022. (Admin.)
June 24, 2022 Filing 194 Minute Entry Re: hearing on 6/24/2022 9:30 AM. Continued. (related document(s): #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) Appearances: JASON R. ADAMS, JASON BLUMBERG, DAWN M. CICA, THOMAS H. FELL, STEVEN T GUBNER, SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ, SUSAN K. SEFLIN, BRIAN D. SHAPIRO, MATTHEW J. STOCKL (Hearing scheduled 07/25/2022 at 09:30 PM at Remote. (anm)
June 24, 2022 Filing 193 Minute Entry Re: hearing on 6/24/2022 9:30 AM. Hearing Off Calendar/ Withdrawn (related document(s): #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (anm)
June 24, 2022 Filing 192 Supplemental Certificate of Service re: Official Form 309F1: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 86), Procedures for Providing Noticing in the Chapter 11 Case (attached hereto as Exhibit A), Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claims (attached hereto as Exhibit B), Official Form 410 Instructions for Proof of Claim (attached hereto as Exhibit C), and Official Form 410 Proof of Claim (attached hereto as Exhibit D) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#86 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) (STRETTO)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 191 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#178 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors.) (cly)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#174 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors.) (cly)
June 24, 2022 Filing 189 Minute Entry Re: hearing on 6/24/2022 9:30 AM. Continued. (related document(s): #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (Hearing scheduled 06/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (pal)
June 24, 2022 Filing 188 341 Meeting Concluded - Assets (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 23, 2022 Filing 187 BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#167 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
June 23, 2022 Filing 186 BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#166 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
June 23, 2022 Filing 185 BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#165 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2022. (Admin.)
June 23, 2022 Filing 184 Certificate of Service re: Declaration of Kendal J. Britton (Docket No. 181), Reply to the U.S. Trustees Objection and Reservation of Rights to the Debtors Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 182), and Declaration of David W. Dachelet in Support of Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327 and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 183) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#181 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #182 Reply filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #183 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
June 23, 2022 Filing 183 Declaration Of: David W. Dachelet in Support of Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#60 Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Debtors Application To Employ Province, LLC As Financial Advisor Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 327(A) And 330 Nunc Pro Tunc To The Petition Date filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN). Modified on 6/24/2022 to relate to doc #60 in place of doc #182 (Carruth, NP).
June 23, 2022 Filing 182 Reply to the U.S. Trustee's Objection and Reservation of Rights to the Debtor's Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#142 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 23, 2022 Filing 181 Declaration Of: Kendal J. Britton Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #162 Reply filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 23, 2022 Filing 180 Certificate of Service of Debtor's Response to LVDF's Objection Purportedly Late Filed Declarations Filed In Support of Motion and Reply Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#173 Response filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 23, 2022 Filing 179 Designation of Local Counsel Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#178 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (CICA, DAWN)
June 23, 2022 Filing 178 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. LAUREN SCHLUSSEL Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 07/7/2022 Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (CICA, DAWN)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#143 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors.) (cly)
June 23, 2022 Filing 176 Adversary case 22-01116. Notice of Removal of Front Sight Management LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company against Las Vegas Development Fund LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, et al.. Fee Amount $350. (72 (Injunctive relief - other)(GUBNER, STEVEN)
June 23, 2022 Filing 175 Designation of Local Counsel Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#174 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (CICA, DAWN)
June 23, 2022 Filing 174 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Jason Adams Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 07/7/2022 Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (CICA, DAWN)
June 23, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice(# 22-11824-abl) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number A20722006, fee amount $ 250.00.(re: Doc#178) (U.S. Treasury)
June 23, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice(# 22-11824-abl) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number A20721237, fee amount $ 250.00.(re: Doc#174) (U.S. Treasury)
June 22, 2022 Filing 173 Response Debtor's Response to LVDF's Objection to Purportedly Late Filed Declarations Filed in Support of Motion and Reply Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#171 Objection filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 22, 2022 Filing 172 Minute Entry Re: hearing on 6/29/2022 1:30 PM. Continued. (related document(s): #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (Hearing scheduled 06/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (pal)
June 22, 2022 Filing 171 Objection TO LATE FILED DECLARATIONS FILED IN SUPPPORT OF MOTION AND REPLY with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#144 Declaration filed by Interested Party FS DIP, LLC, #161 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #163 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN). Modified on 6/23/2022 to remove relationship to doc #4 and doc #59 (Carruth, NP).
June 22, 2022 Filing 170 Designation of Local Counsel Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#143 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (CICA, DAWN)
June 21, 2022 Filing 169 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 05/31/2022 Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Cash Flow, Balance Sheet, Profit and Loss #2 Exhibit Pre-Petition Checks) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 21, 2022 Filing 168 Reply FS DIP, LLC's Reply to Preliminary Response and Limited Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Emergency Motion for Entry of a Final Order (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens and Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing the Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief with Certificate of Service Filed by SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ on behalf of FS DIP, LLC (Related document(s)#147 Response filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors.) (SCHWARTZ, SAMUEL). Modified on 6/22/2022 to remove relationship to doc #4 (Carruth, NP).
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#157 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES.) (cly)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#155 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES.) (cly)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#153 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES.) (cly)
June 21, 2022 Filing 164 Certificate of Service re: Reply to the U.S. Trustees Objection and Reservation of Rights to the Debtors Application to Employ BG Law LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to May 24, 2022 (Docket No. 160), Declaration of Paul Huygens in Support of the Debtors DIP Financing Motion [ECF No. 4] (Docket No. 161), Debtors Omnibus Reply to Objections to DIP Financing Motion (Docket No. 162), and Declaration of Ignatius Piazza in Further Support of the Debtors Remaining First Day Emergency Motions (Docket No. 163) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#160 Reply filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #161 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #162 Reply filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #163 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
June 20, 2022 Filing 163 Declaration Of: Ignatius Piazza Declaration of Ignatius Piazza in Further Support of the Debtor's Remaining First Day Emergency Motions Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN). Modified on 6/21/2022 to remove relationship to doc #162 (Carruth, NP).
June 20, 2022 Filing 162 Omnibus Reply Debtor's Omnibus Reply to Objections to DIP Financing Motion Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#31 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11, #35 Opposition filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #117 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11, #121 Opposition filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #125 Opposition filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES, #147 Response filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 20, 2022 Filing 161 Declaration Of: Paul Huygens in Support of the Debtor's DIP Financing Motion [ECF No. 4] Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 20, 2022 Filing 160 Reply to the U.S. Trustee's Objection and Reservation of Rights to the Debtor's Application to Employ BG Law LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to May 24, 2022 Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#128 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 20, 2022 Filing 159 Certificate of Service Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (Related document(s)#153 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES, #154 Designation of Local Counsel filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES, #155 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES, #156 Designation of Local Counsel filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES, #157 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES, #158 Designation of Local Counsel filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES) (FELL, THOMAS)
June 20, 2022 Filing 158 Designation of Local Counsel and Consent Thereto (Marc J. Winthrop) Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (Related document(s)#157 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES) (FELL, THOMAS)
June 20, 2022 Filing 157 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. (Marc J. Winthrop) Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 07/5/2022 Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (FELL, THOMAS)
June 20, 2022 Filing 156 Designation of Local Counsel and Consent Thereto (Matthew J. Stockl) Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (Related document(s)#155 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES) (FELL, THOMAS)
June 20, 2022 Filing 155 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. (Matthew J. Stockl) Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 07/5/2022 Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (FELL, THOMAS)
June 20, 2022 Filing 154 Designation of Local Counsel and Consent Thereto (Garrick A. Hollander) Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (Related document(s)#153 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES) (FELL, THOMAS)
June 20, 2022 Filing 153 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. (Garrick A. Hollander) Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 07/5/2022 Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (FELL, THOMAS)
June 20, 2022 Filing 152 Notice of Appearance and, Request for Special Notice and Copies of All Filed Plans an Disclosure Statements Filed by TERESA M. PILATOWICZ on behalf of JENNIFER PIAZZA, IGNATIUS PIAZZA (PILATOWICZ, TERESA)
June 20, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice(# 22-11824-abl) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number A20715685, fee amount $ 250.00.(re: Doc#153) (U.S. Treasury)
June 20, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice(# 22-11824-abl) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number A20715691, fee amount $ 250.00.(re: Doc#155) (U.S. Treasury)
June 20, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice(# 22-11824-abl) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number A20715708, fee amount $ 250.00.(re: Doc#157) (U.S. Treasury)
June 17, 2022 Filing 151 Certificate of Service re: Order Authorizing the Debtor to Honor and Continue Certain Customer Programs and Customer Obligations in the Ordinary Course of Business (Docket No. 141), Declaration of William Wilson (Docket No. 144), Preliminary Response and Limited Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Emergency Motion for Entry of a Final Order (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post-petition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens and Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing the Debtors use of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 147), and Submission of Stalking Horse Agreement in Connection with Debtors DIP Financing Motion (Docket No. 150) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#141 Order, #144 Declaration filed by Interested Party FS DIP, LLC, #147 Response filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #150 Document filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
June 17, 2022 Filing 150 Document Submission of Stalking Horse Agreement in Connection with Debtor's DIP Financing Motion Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 17, 2022 Filing 149 Supplemental Certificate of Service Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#33 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #42 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #43 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #44 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #50 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #58 Notice filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11, #59 Order, #60 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #61 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #64 Order on Application to Employ, #65 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #79 Order on Motion for Order Shortening Time, #80 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #81 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #82 Order, #85 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #86 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) (STRETTO)
June 17, 2022 Filing 148 Certificate of Service Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#147 Response filed by Cred. Comm. Chair Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors) (CICA, DAWN)
June 17, 2022 Filing 147 Preliminary Response and Limited Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Emergency Motion for Entry of a Final Order (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens and Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing the Debtors Use of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (CICA, DAWN). Modified on 6/21/2022 to remove relationship to doc #35, doc #121, and doc #125 (Carruth, NP).
June 17, 2022 Filing 146 Certificate of Service Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#142 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 17, 2022 Filing 145 Certificate of Service Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#129 Certificate of Service filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 17, 2022 Filing 144 Declaration Of: William Wilson Filed by SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ on behalf of FS DIP, LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SCHWARTZ, SAMUEL)
June 17, 2022 Filing 143 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Robert L. LeHane, Esq. Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 07/1/2022 Filed by TRACY M. O'STEEN on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (O'STEEN, TRACY)
June 17, 2022 Filing 142 Objection OBJECTION AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE TO THE DEBTORS APPLICATION TO EMPLOY PROVINCE, LLC AS FINANCIAL ADVISOR PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. 327(a) AND 330 NUNC PRO TUNC TO THE PETITION DATE Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#60 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Order Authorizing The Debtor To Honor And Continue Certain Customer Programs And Customer Obligations In The Ordinary Course Of Business (Related document(s)#13 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (mmm)
June 17, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice(# 22-11824-abl) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number A20713318, fee amount $ 250.00.(re: Doc#143) (U.S. Treasury)
June 16, 2022 Filing 140 BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf (Related document(s)#131 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-BK)) No. of Notices: 2926. Notice Date 06/16/2022. (Admin.)
June 16, 2022 Filing 139 Amended Subpoena NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENAS with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 16, 2022 Filing 138 Amended Subpoena NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENAS with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 15, 2022 Filing 137 Non-Individual Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedule[s] A/B, Real Property Amount: $ 25260000, Personal Property Amount: $ 4335015.12, D, Creditors Holding Secured Claims Amount: $ 11152956, E/F, Creditors Holding Unsecured Priority Claims Amount: $ 167294.67, Creditors Holding Unsecured Nonpriority claims Amount: $ 6884698.10, G, H, Declaration Concerning Debtor[s] Schedules, , Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s) 22 Set Deficient Filing Deadlines) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 15, 2022 Filing 136 Request for Special Notice with Certificate of Service Filed by DAWN M. CICA on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (CICA, DAWN)
June 15, 2022 Filing 135 Stipulated/Agreed Order (Related document(s)#132 Stipulation filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11.) (mmm)
June 14, 2022 Filing 134 Supplemental Declaration Of: Paul Huygens in Support of Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#60 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #61 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 14, 2022 Filing 133 Notice of Appearance , Request for Special Notice Filed by WILLIAM C DEVINE II on behalf of KEITH WADE GORMAN (DEVINE, WILLIAM)
June 14, 2022 Filing 132 Stipulation By U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 and Between FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, FS DIP, LLC, LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC AND THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS TO EXTEND THE OBJECTION DEADLINE TO FINAL RELIEF FOR CERTAIN FIRST DAY MOTIONS FOR THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS AND ITS COUNSEL TO FRIDAY, JUNE 17, 2022 AT 12:00 P.M. PACIFIC TIME Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#118 Stipulated/Agreed Order) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 13, 2022 Filing 131 Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 130 . (admin)
June 13, 2022 Filing 130 Partial Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 05/27/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number (855) 873-2223. Purchasing Party: Jennifer Warner. Redaction Request Due By 07/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/14/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 09/12/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
June 13, 2022 Filing 129 Certificate of Service Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#128 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 13, 2022 Filing 128 Objection Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#42 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 10, 2022 Filing 127 Certificate of Service Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (Related document(s)#125 Opposition filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES, #126 Declaration filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES) (FELL, THOMAS)
June 10, 2022 Filing 126 Declaration Of: Michael Meacher in Support of Opposition to Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders: (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens and Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing the Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (Related document(s)#125 Opposition filed by Creditor MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2) (FELL, THOMAS)
June 10, 2022 Filing 125 Opposition to Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders: (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens and Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing the Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by THOMAS H. FELL on behalf of MICHAEL MEACHER, dba BANKGROUP FINANCIAL SERVICES (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (FELL, THOMAS)
June 10, 2022 Filing 124 Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#121 Opposition filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #122 Declaration filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #123 Objection filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
June 10, 2022 Filing 123 Objection Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#33 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 10, 2022 Filing 122 Declaration Of: ANDREA M. CHAMPION Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#121 Opposition filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 10, 2022 Filing 121 Opposition Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party, and remove relationship to doc #35 (Carruth, NP).
June 10, 2022 Filing 120 Supplemental Certificate of Service re: Order Scheduling Status Conference (Docket No. 29) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#29 Order to Set Hearing.) (STRETTO)
June 10, 2022 Filing 119 Certificate of Service Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#117 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 10, 2022 Filing 118 Stipulated/Agreed Order (Related document(s)#113 Stipulation filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11.) (cly)
June 10, 2022 Filing 117 Omnibus Objection THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEES REASSERTION OF HER OMNIBUS OBJECTION AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS [ECF NO. 31] TO FINAL RELIEF OF THE DEBTORS FIRST DAY MOTIONS [ECF NOS. 4 & 12] Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 9, 2022 Filing 116 Amended Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 9, 2022 Filing 115 Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 9, 2022 Filing 114 Notice of Appearance CREDITOR ARMSCOR PRECISION INTERNATIONALS NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE IN BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDING with Certificate of Service Filed by BART K. LARSEN on behalf of ARMSCOR PRECISION INTERNATIONAL (LARSEN, BART) Modified on 6/10/2022 to reflect correct filing party (Hannan, KS).
June 8, 2022 Filing 113 Stipulation By U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 and Between FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, FS DIP, LLC, AND LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC TO EXTEND THE OBJECTION DEADLINE TO FINAL RELIEF FOR CERTAIN FIRST DAY MOTIONS FOR ANY OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS AND ITS COUNSEL TO WEDNESDAY, JUNE 15, 2022 Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #59 Order, #81 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
June 7, 2022 Filing 112 Verification of Creditor Matrix [Redacted Per ECF No. 82] Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s) 22 Set Deficient Filing Deadlines) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 7, 2022 Filing 111 Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (GUBNER, STEVEN)
June 7, 2022 Filing 110 List of Equity Security Holders Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (GUBNER, STEVEN)
June 7, 2022 Filing 109 Amended Voluntary Petition. Item(s) Amended: Current Version of Official Form 201. Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (GUBNER, STEVEN)
June 7, 2022 Filing 108 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s) 22 Set Deficient Filing Deadlines) (GUBNER, STEVEN)
June 6, 2022 Filing 107 Request for Electronically Certified Copy. Fee Amount $11 Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 6, 2022 Filing 106 Subpoena NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENAS with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 6, 2022 Filing 105 Subpoena NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENAS with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 6, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Request for Electronically Certified Copy(# 22-11824-abl) [misc,reqcercp] ( 11.00). Receipt number A20698779, fee amount $ 11.00.(re: Doc# 107 ) (U.S. Treasury)
June 4, 2022 Filing 104 BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#84 Order Approving Verified Petition) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/04/2022. (Admin.)
June 4, 2022 Filing 103 BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf (Related document(s)#67 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-BK)) No. of Notices: 84. Notice Date 06/04/2022. (Admin.)
June 3, 2022 Filing 102 Certificate of Service re: Order Granting Debtors Emergency Application for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Employ and Retain Stretto as Claims, Noticing and Solicitation Agent (Docket No. 64), Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Hear the Debtors Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 65), Notice of Hearing and Order Shortening Time to Hear the Debtors Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327 and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 79), Order Granting Debtors Emergency Motion for Order Extending the Time to File Bankruptcy Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs (Docket No. 80), Interim Order Authorizing Maintenance of Certain Prepetition Bank Accounts and Merchant Accounts and Cash Management System (Docket No. 81), Order on Debtors Emergency Motion for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 102, 105, and 502(b)(9), Bankruptcy Rules 2002, 3003(c)(3), 9007, and 9036, and Local Rules 1007, and 3003: (I) Authorizing the Establishment of Certain Notice Procedures; (II) Establishing Bar Dates and Procedures for Filing Proofs of Claim; and (III) Authorizing the Debtor to Keep its Member List Confidential (Docket No. 82), Notice of Hearing on Debtors Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 85), Official Form 309F1: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 86), Procedures for Providing Noticing in the Chapter 11 Case (attached hereto as Exhibit A), Notice of Bar Date for Filing Proofs of Claims (attached hereto as Exhibit B), Official Form 410 Instructions for Proof of Claim (attached hereto as Exhibit C), Official Form 410 Proof of Claim (attached hereto as Exhibit D) with Certificate of Service Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#64 Order on Application to Employ, #65 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #79 Order on Motion for Order Shortening Time, #80 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #81 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #82 Order, #85 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #86 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11) (STRETTO)
June 3, 2022 Filing 101 Subpoena NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENAS with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #78) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #77) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #76) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #75) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #73) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #74) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #72) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #71) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #70) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination (Related document(s) #68) (mmm)
June 3, 2022 Filing 90 Notice Of Remote Hearings In This Case To Be Held Via Zoom (mah)
June 2, 2022 Filing 89 Declaration Of: Susan K. Seflin with Certificate of Service Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#88 Opposition filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 2, 2022 Filing 88 Opposition Omnibus Opposition to the Ex Parte Motions for Orders Directing Examination Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 with Certificate of Service Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#68 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #69 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #70 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #71 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #72 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #73 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #74 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #75 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #76 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #77 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #78 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 2, 2022 Filing 87 Deadline(s) Set/Reset/Terminate (ksh)
June 2, 2022 Filing 86 Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic - Chapter 11 LV. Proof of Claim due by 8/8/2022 (ksh)
June 2, 2022 Filing 85 Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Hearing Date: 06/27/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#60 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#27 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (mmm)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Order Approving Verified Petition (Related document(s)#28 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (mmm)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Order On Debtor's Emergency Motion For Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Sections 102, 105, and 502(b)(9), Bankruptcy Rules 2002, 3003(c)(3), 9007, And 9036, And Local Rules 1007, And 3003: (I) Authorizing The Establishment Of Certain Notice Procedures; (II) Establishing Bar Dates And Procedures For Filing Proofs Of Claim; And (III) Authorizing The Debtor To Keep Its Member List Confidential (Related document(s)#6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D) (mmm)
June 2, 2022 Filing 81 Interim Order Authorizing Maintenance Of Certain Prepetition Bank Accounts And Merchant Accounts And Cash Management System (Related Doc #7) (mmm)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order Granting Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions(Related Doc #8) (mmm)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time (Related document(s) #65). Hearing scheduled 6/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (Related document(s)#60 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (mmm)
June 2, 2022 Filing 78 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination THE CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF BANK OF TEXAS with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 77 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination OF THE CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 76 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination OF THE CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 75 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination IGNATIUS PIAZZA AS TRUSTEE OF THE VNV DYNASTY TRUST II with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 74 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination OF IGNATIUS PIAZZA AS TRUSTEE OF THE VNV DYNASTY TRUST I with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 73 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination OF JENNIFER PIAZZA AS TRUSTEE OF THE VNV DYNASTY TRUST II with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 72 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination OF JENNIFER PIAZZA AS TRUSTEE OF THE VNV DYNASTY TRUST I with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 71 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination OF JENNIFER PIAZZA with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 70 Amended Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination OF IGNATIUS PIAZZA with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#69 Motion for Examination filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC)(SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 69 Emergency Motion for 2004 Examination OF IGNATIUS PIAZZA with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 2, 2022 Filing 68 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination OF IGNATIUS PIAZZA AS MANAGER OF FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT, LLC with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
June 1, 2022 Filing 67 Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 63 . (admin)
June 1, 2022 Filing 66 Attorney Information Sheet Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#65 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 1, 2022 Filing 65 Motion for Order Shortening Time Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#60 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC)(SEFLIN, SUSAN)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order Granting Application To Employ And Retain Stretto As Claims, Noticing And Solicitation Agent (Related document(s) #18) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(mmm)
June 1, 2022 Filing 63 Partial Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 05/27/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number 855-873-2223. Purchasing Party: Jennifer Warner. Redaction Request Due By 06/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/5/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 08/30/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
June 1, 2022 Filing 62 Certificate of Service re: Order Granting Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order: (1) Authorizing, but not Requiring, Debtor to Pay or Honor (A) Prepetition Wages, Salaries, and Other Compensation Including Reimbursement of Expenses and (B) Prepetition Medical, Workers Compensation, Paid Time Off, and Similar Benefits; and (2) Authorizing and Directing Applicable Banks and Other Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Presented for Payment and to Honor Fund Transfer Requests (Docket No. 50), Notice of Telephonic Section 341 Meeting (Docket No. 58), Interim Order on Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders: (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens and Administrative Expense Clams, (III) Authorizing the Debtors use of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 59), Debtors Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 60), and Declaration of Paul Huygens in Support of Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Docket No. 61) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#50 Order on Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions, #58 Notice filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11, #59 Order, #60 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #61 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
May 31, 2022 Filing 61 Declaration Of: Paul Huygens in Support of Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#60 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 31, 2022 Filing 60 Application to Employ Province, LLC as Financial Advisor Debtors Application To Employ Province, LLC As Financial Advisor Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. 327(A) And 330 Nunc Pro Tunc To The Petition Date with Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 31, 2022 Filing 59 Interim Order On Debtor's Emergency Motion For Entry Of Interim And Final Orders: (I) Authorizing Debtor To Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens And Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing The Debtor's Use Of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying The Automatic Stay, And (V) Granting Related Relief (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (mmm)
May 31, 2022 Filing 58 Notice of revised call-in number, 1-888-673-9783, passcode 5881294, for 341(a) meeting to be held 06/23/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (BNC)) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
May 31, 2022 Filing 57 Designation of Local Counsel Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER, Jessica S. Wellington on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#27 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (GUBNER, STEVEN)
May 31, 2022 Filing 56 Designation of Local Counsel Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER, Susan K. Seflin on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#28 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (GUBNER, STEVEN)
May 31, 2022 Filing 55 Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 6/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (Related document(s)#42 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (mmm)
May 31, 2022 Filing 54 Certificate of Service of the Amended Declaration of Susan K. Seflin in Response to LVDF's Statement of Objections to Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#48 Reply filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Order Granting Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions(Related Doc #9) (mmm)
May 31, 2022 Filing 49 Certificate of Service re: Supplemental Declaration of Ignatius Piazza in Support of First Day Motions (Docket No. 33), Debtors Application to Employ BG Law LLP Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 as General Bankruptcy Counsel Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to May 24, 2022; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Docket No. 42), Declaration of Steven T. Gubner in Support of Debtors Application to Employ BG Law LLP Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 as General Bankruptcy Counsel Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to May 24, 2022 (Docket No. 43), and Notice of Hearing on Debtors Application to Employ BG Law LLP Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 as General Bankruptcy Counsel Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to May 24, 2022 (Docket No. 44) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#33 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #42 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #43 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #44 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
May 30, 2022 Filing 48 Amended Reply Amended Declaration of Susan K. Seflin in Response to LVDF's Statement of Objections to Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#46 Brief filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 30, 2022 Filing 47 Reply Declaration of Susan K. Seflin in Response to LVDF's Statement of Objections to Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#46 Brief filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC.) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 30, 2022 Filing 46 Brief STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED ORDER IN ACCORDANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 9021(b)(2) with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
May 27, 2022 Filing 53 Minute Entry Re: hearing on 5/27/2022 9:30 AM. Continued. (related document(s): #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) Appearances: JASON BLUMBERG, STEVEN T GUBNER, EDWARD M. MCDONALD, SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ, SUSAN K. SEFLIN, BRIAN D. SHAPIRO (Final Hearing scheduled 06/24/2022 at 09:30 AM at ABL Teleconference Line. (anm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 52 Minute Entry Re: hearing on 5/27/2022 9:30 AM. Continued. (related document(s): #4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) Appearances: JASON BLUMBERG, STEVEN T GUBNER, EDWARD M. MCDONALD, SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ, SUSAN K. SEFLIN, BRIAN D. SHAPIRO (Final Hearing scheduled 06/24/2022 at 09:30 AM at ABL Teleconference Line. (anm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 51 Minute Entry Re: hearing on 5/27/2022 9:30 AM. Continued. (related document(s): #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) Appearances: JASON BLUMBERG, STEVEN T GUBNER, EDWARD M. MCDONALD, SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ, SUSAN K. SEFLIN, BRIAN D. SHAPIRO (Final Hearing scheduled 06/24/2022 at 09:30 AM at ABL Teleconference Line. (anm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 45 BNC Certificate of Notice. (Related document(s)#23 Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing-Ch 11 Non-Individual (BNC)) No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/27/2022. (Admin.)
May 27, 2022 Filing 44 Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Application to Employ BG Law LLP Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 as General Bankruptcy Counsel Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to May 24, 2022 Hearing Date: June 27, 2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#42 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (GUBNER, STEVEN)
May 27, 2022 Filing 43 Declaration Of: Steven T. Gubner in Support of Debtor's Application to Employ BG Law LLP Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and 330 as General Bankruptcy Counsel Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to May 24, 2022 Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#42 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (GUBNER, STEVEN)
May 27, 2022 Filing 42 Application to Employ BG Law LLP as General Bankruptcy Counsel Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to May 24, 2022; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (GUBNER, STEVEN)
May 27, 2022 Filing 41 Certificate of Service re: Order Scheduling Status Conference (Docket No. 29) with Certificate of Service Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#29 Order to Set Hearing.) (STRETTO)
May 27, 2022 Filing 40 Errata with Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#37 Declaration filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
May 27, 2022 Filing 39 Certificate of Service Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#35 Opposition filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #36 Declaration filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #37 Declaration filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC, #38 Motion to Seal filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS LAND DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN)
May 27, 2022 Filing 38 Ex Parte Motion to Seal Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#37 Declaration filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC)(SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
May 27, 2022 Filing 37 Declaration Of: ROBERT W. DZIUBLA Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#35 Opposition filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5 #6 Exhibit 6 #7 Exhibit 7 #8 Appendix 8 #9 Exhibit 9 #10 Exhibit 10 #11 Exhibit 11) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
May 27, 2022 Filing 36 Declaration Of: ANDREA CHAMPION Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#35 Opposition filed by Creditor LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
May 27, 2022 Filing 35 Opposition Filed by BRIAN D. SHAPIRO on behalf of LAS VEGAS DEVELOPMENT FUND, LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (SHAPIRO, BRIAN) Modified on 6/13/2022 to correct filing party (Carruth, NP).
May 26, 2022 Filing 34 Certificate of Service re: Supplemental Declaration Of: Ignatius Piazza in Support of First Day Motions Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#33 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
May 26, 2022 Filing 33 Supplemental Declaration Of: Ignatius Piazza in Support of First Day Motions Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #13 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 26, 2022 Filing 32 Certificate of Service Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#26 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11, #31 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
May 26, 2022 Filing 31 Omnibus Objection THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEES OMNIBUS OBJECTION AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS TO DEBTORS FIRST DAY MOTIONS Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #10 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
May 26, 2022 Filing 30 Certificate of Service re: First-Day Motions (Docket Nos. 4, 6, 7, 8, 9, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 18), Notice of Hearing and Order Shortening Time to Hear the Debtors First Day Emergency Motions (Docket No. 24), and Notice of Hearings on Debtors First Day Emergency Motions (Docket No. 25) Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #11 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #13 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #14 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #15 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #18 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #24 Order on Motion for Order Shortening Time, #25 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order Scheduling Status Conference. Status Hearing to be held on 6/29/2022 at 01:30 PM at Remote. (Related document(s)#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (cly)
May 26, 2022 Filing 26 Objection Objection of the United States Trustee to Debtors Motion to (ii) Keep its Member List Confidential, (ii) Shorten The Claims Bar Date, and (iii) Establish Certain Noticing Procedures Filed by JASON BLUMBERG on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (Related document(s)#6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (BLUMBERG, JASON)
May 25, 2022 Filing 28 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Receipt Number 242761 Fee Amount $250. Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (mag)
May 25, 2022 Filing 27 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Receipt Number 242762 Fee Amount $250. Filed by JESSICA S WELLINGTON on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (mag)
May 25, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearings on Debtor's First Day Emergency Motions Hearing Date: 05/27/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 a.m. Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #13 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #18 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Granting Motion for Order Shortening Time (Related document(s) #15). Hearing scheduled 5/27/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #13 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #18 Application to Employ filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC.) (mar)
May 25, 2022 Filing 23 Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. (egp)
May 25, 2022 Filing 21 Omnibus Declaration Of: Ignatius Piazza in Support of First Day Motions (re-filed to include case number) Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #13 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed DIP Term Sheet #2 Exhibit B - DIP Budget #3 Exhibit C - Loan Documents #4 Exhibit D - Appraisal #5 Exhibit E - Title Report #6 Exhibit F - Nye County Lien Search #7 Exhibit G - NV UCC Search #8 Exhibit H - May 1 - 15 Payroll Breakdown #9 Exhibit I - May 16 - 24 Payroll Breakdown),#18 Application to Employ STRETTO as Claims, Noticing and Solicitation Agent filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC. (SEFLIN, SUSAN). Modified on 5/26/2022 to remove relationship to docs #10,11 and add relationship to doc #18 (Hannan, KS).
May 25, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Docketing Error (Related document(s)#16 Attorney Information Sheet filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (cly)
May 25, 2022 Filing 19 Notice of Docketing Error (Related document(s)#14 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (cly)
May 25, 2022 Filing 17 Certificate of Service re: Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders: (1) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens and Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing the Debtors Use of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 4), Debtors Emergency Motion for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 102, 105, and 502(b)(9), Bankruptcy Rules 2002, 3003(c)(3), 9007, and 9036, and Local Rules 1007, and 3003: (I) Authorizing the Establishment of Certain Notice Procedures; (II) Establishing Bar Dates and Procedures for Filing Proofs of Claim; and (III) Authorizing the Debtor to Keep its Member List Confidential (Docket No. 6), Debtors Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Maintenance of Certain Prepetition Bank Accounts and Merchant Accounts and Cash Management System (Docket No. 7), Debtors Emergency Motion for Order Extending the Time to File Bankruptcy Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Docket No. 8), Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order: (1) Authorizing, but Not Requiring, Debtor to Pay or Honor (A) Prepetition Wages, Salaries, And Other Compensation Including Reimbursement of Expenses and (B) Prepetition Medical, Workers Compensation, Paid Time Off, and Similar Benefits; and (2) Authorizing and Directing Applicable Banks And Other Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Presented for Payment and to Honor Fund Transfer Requests; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Docket No. 9), Debtors Emergency Application for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Employ and Retain Stretto as Claims, Noticing and Solicitation Agent (Docket No. 10), Declaration of Sheryl Betance in Support of Debtors Emergency Application for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Employ and Retain Stretto as Claims, Noticing and Solicitation Agent (Docket No. 11), Debtors Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Critical Vendors and Certain Prepetition Tax Liabilities; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Docket No. 12), Debtors Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Honor and Continue Certain Customer Programs and Customer Obligations in the Ordinary Course of Business (Docket No. 13), and Omnibus Declaration of Ignatius Piazza in Support of First Day Motions (Docket No. 14) with Certificate of Service Filed by STRETTO (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #10 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #11 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #13 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #14 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (STRETTO)
May 24, 2022 Filing 22 Set Deficient Filing Deadlines. Incomplete Filings due by 6/7/2022. Deficient Matrix due by 5/31/2022. Verification of Creditor Matrix due by 6/7/2022. List of all creditors due by 6/7/2022. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due by 6/7/2022. Schedule A/B due by 6/7/2022. Schedule D due by 6/7/2022.Schedule E/F due by 6/7/2022. Schedule G due by 6/7/2022. Schedule H due by 6/7/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due by 6/7/2022. Atty Disclosure Statement due by 6/7/2022. Declaration Re: E-Filing due by 6/7/2022. List of Equity Security Holders due by 6/7/2022. (egp)
May 24, 2022 Filing 18 Application to Employ STRETTO as Claims, Noticing and Solicitation Agent with Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (cly)
May 24, 2022 Filing 16 Attorney Information Sheet Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#15 Motion for Order Shortening Time filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 24, 2022 Filing 15 Ex Parte Motion for Order Shortening Time to Hear the Debtor's First Day Emergency Motions; Declaration of Steven T. Gubner Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #18 Application to Employ STRETTO as Claims, Noticing and Solicitation Agent filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #13 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC)(GUBNER, STEVEN) Modified on 5/25/2022 to relate to doc #18 in place of doc #10 (Carruth, NP).
May 24, 2022 Filing 14 Omnibus Declaration Of: Ignatius Piazza in Support of First Day Motions Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#4 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #6 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #7 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #8 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #9 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #10 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #11 Declaration filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC, #13 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed DIP Term Sheet #2 Exhibit B - DIP Budget #3 Exhibit C - Loan Documents #4 Exhibit D - Appraisal #5 Exhibit E - Title Report #6 Exhibit F - Nye County Lien Search #7 Exhibit G - NV UCC Search #8 Exhibit H - May 1 - 15 Payroll Breakdown #9 Exhibit I - May 16-24 Payroll Breakdown) (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 24, 2022 Filing 13 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtor's Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Honor and Continue Certain Customer Programs and Customer Obligations in the Ordinary Course of Business with Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 24, 2022 Filing 12 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtor's Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor to Pay Critical Vendors and Certain Prepetition Tax Liabilities; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof with Proposed Order Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (GUBNER, STEVEN)
May 24, 2022 Filing 11 Declaration Of: Sheryl Betance In Support Of Debtor's Emergency Application for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Employ and Retain Stretto as Claims, Noticing and Solicitation Agent Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (Related document(s)#18 Application to Employ STRETTO as Claims, Noticing and Solicitation Agent filed by Debtor FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC) (SEFLIN, SUSAN) Modified on 5/25/2022 to relate to doc #18 in place of doc #10 (Carruth, NP).
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 (NONCONFORMING ENTRY) Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtor's Emergency Application for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtor to Employ and Retain Stretto as Claims, Noticing and Solicitation Agent with Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN) Modified on 5/25/2022 to reflect docket entry change, see doc #18 (Carruth, NP).
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order: (1) Authorizing, But Not Requiring, Debtor to Pay or Honor (A) Prepetition Wages, Salaries, and Other Compensation Including Reimbursement of Expenses and (B) Prepetition Medical, Workers' Compensation, Paid Time Off, and Similar Benefits; and (2) Authorizing and Directing Applicable Banks and Other Financial Institutions to Receive, Process, Honor, and Pay Checks Presented for Payment and to Honor Fund Transfer Requests; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtor's Emergency Motion for Order Extending the Time to File Bankruptcy Schedules and Statements of Financial Affairs; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof with Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtor's Emergency Motion for Order Authorizing Maintenance of Certain Prepetition Bank Accounts and Merchant Accounts and Cash Management System with Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Debtor's Emergency Motion for Order (I) Authorizing the Establishment of Certain Notice Procedures; (II) Establishing Bar Dates and Procedures for Filing Proofs of Claim; and (III) Authorizing the Debtor to Keep its Member List Confidential with Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 24, 2022 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance and, Request for Special Notice Filed by SAMUEL A. SCHWARTZ on behalf of FS DIP, LLC (SCHWARTZ, SAMUEL)
May 24, 2022 Filing 4 Emergency Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders: (I) Authorizing Debtor to Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Granting Priming Liens and Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Authorizing the Debtor's Use of Cash Collateral, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (V) Granting Related Relief with Proposed Order Filed by SUSAN K. SEFLIN on behalf of FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC (SEFLIN, SUSAN)
May 24, 2022 Filing 3 Meeting of Creditors 341 Meeting to be held on 6/23/2022 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic - Chapter 11 LV. Proof of Claim due by 9/21/2022.
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Filed by EDWARD M. MCDONALD on behalf of U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11 (MCDONALD, EDWARD)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738. Filed by STEVEN T GUBNER on behalf of Front Sight Management LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/21/2022. (GUBNER, STEVEN)
May 24, 2022 Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(# 22-11824) [misc,volp11pb] (1738.00). Receipt number A20682894, fee amount $1738.00.(re: Doc#1) (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: FRONT SIGHT MANAGEMENT LLC
Represented By: STEVEN T GUBNER
Represented By: SUSAN K. SEFLIN
Represented By: JESSICA L. BAGDANOV
Represented By: BG LAW LLP
Represented By: Jessica L Bagdanov
Represented By: JASON B. KOMORSKY
Represented By: JESSICA S WELLINGTON
Represented By: JESSICA S. WELLINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: CHAPTER 11 - LV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
Represented By: EDWARD M. MCDONALD
Represented By: JASON BLUMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: STRETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: JASON R. ADAMS
Represented By: DAWN M. CICA
Represented By: ROBERT L LEHANE
Represented By: TRACY M. O'STEEN
Represented By: LAUREN S. SCHLUSSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?