LARRY EDWARD ADAMS V. E. K. MCDANIEL ET AL
Petitioner: Larry Edward Adamsely
Respondent: Frankie Sue Del Papa and E.K. McDaniel
Unknown: John L. Arrascada, Glynn Cartledge, Rene L. Hulse and Dennis C. Wilson
Case Number: 2:1998cv01441
Filed: January 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER that 285 petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60(b)) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED with respect to this decision.FURTHER ORDERED that 288 petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of February 3, 2017. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting 265 Motion to Extend Deadline. Replies due by 3/6/2012 re 260 MOTION to Amend or Alter Amended Judgment. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 2/21/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER petitioners request to entertain a motion for relief pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 250 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER: Respondents' 227 Motion to Strike is Denied. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 01/29/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LARRY EDWARD ADAMS V. E. K. MCDANIEL ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Edward Adamsely
Represented By: Michael Pescetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: John L. Arrascada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Glynn Cartledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Rene L. Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Dennis C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Frankie Sue Del Papa
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E.K. McDaniel
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?