George W. Luster, Jr. VS Director Nevada Dept of Corrections, etal
Case Number: 2:2004cv00334
Filed: March 22, 2004
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER denying 196 Motion for Relief. Certificate of appealability Denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Granting Petitioner's 192 Motion to Reopen Time to File an Appeal. The time to file an appeal of the Court's 189 Order is reopened for a period of 14 days after the date this Order is entered. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate Robert W. Story as the attorney of record for the Petitioner and serve this order on the Petitioner (see Order for address). Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MINUTE ORDER denying petitioner's motion 190 as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JRB)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER that Petitioner's 183 , 184 , and 185 Motions are Denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability with respect to this decision. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USCA - SLD)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Granting in Part Respondents' 141 Motion to Dismiss and that Ground 4 of the 123 Sixth Amended Petition is DISMISSED with prejudice as procedurally defaulted. Within 45 days of entry of this order, respondents shall file an ans wer on the merits to the remaining claims in the Sixth Amended Petition. Counsel shall send a hard copy of all exhibits filed to, for this case, the Las Vegas Clerk's Office. Petitioner shall have 30 days from service of the answer to file a reply. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 3/7/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER that petitioners counsel shall file an amended certificate of service reflecting that counsel has served the motion on petitioner in proper person, as required by Local Rule IA 10-6(b), together with a copy of this order. Petitioner shall have 30 days to mail to the Clerk of Court for filing any response in proper person to 147 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER that 142 and 143 MOTIONS for Extension of Time to Respond re 141 Motion to Dismiss are GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Responses due by 6/25/2013. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 6/24/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER that, 98 Letter is stricken, and petitioner shall not communicate with the Court other than through counsel. Granting in part and Denying in part 137 Motion to stay consideration of 133 motion to withdraw. Denying wit hout prejudice 133 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Within 10 days of entry of this order, petitioners counsel shall file a notice that counsel has provided petitioner with a copy of this order. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER that respondents shall have 60 days from entry of this order within which to respond to the petition, as amended. Petitioner shall have 30 days from service of the answer, motion to dismiss, or other response to file a reply or opposition. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 3/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 105 and 107 Motions to Extend Time. Denying 116 Motion for a Status Conference. Amended Petition due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 4/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDERED that the petitioner's motion 101 to reopen is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motions 102 and 103 for extension of time are GRANTED nunc pro tunc, and the time for petitioner to file an amended petition is extended up to and including 9/7/11. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 8/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDERED that, within three judicial days of entry of this order, petitioner's counsel either shall file the notice directed by the Court's prior order 97 or shall show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon counsel for the failur e to comply with the Court's order. FURTHER ORDERED that, within ten days of entry of this order, petitioner's counsel additionally shall file a notice that counsel has provided petitioner with a copy of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that 98 is STRICKEN and petitioner shall not communicate with the Court other than through counsel. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 5/16/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and to Atty Cartledge via US mail - MMM)
January 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Granting 28 Motion to Reopen Case. Federal public defender shall have 30 days to undertake representation, if able. Signed by Judge Roger L. Hunt on 1/4/07. (AXM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George W. Luster, Jr. VS Director Nevada Dept of Corrections, etal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?