Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV v. KXD Technology, Inc., et al
Case Number: 2:2005cv01532
Filed: December 28, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 ORDER FOR DESTRUCTION OF EXHIBITS The Clerk's Office having given notice to counsel as prescribed by LR 79-1 and LCR 55-1 of the Local Rules of Practice of this Court, and counsel having failed to make arrangements to retrieve the exhibits in the allotted time, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is authorized to destroy the exhibits previously admitted in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 1/27/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 981 ORDER REGARDING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The 969 Findings and Recommendation are Affirmed and Accepted and Adopted, Counsel's 967 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Starr H. Arvay is Granted. Counsel's 967 Motion to Adjudicate Attorney's Lien is Denied. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 02/17/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 969 ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The 967 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Amoi Electronics, Ltd, Amoi Electronics Co., Ltd, Amoi Electronics, Inc. is Granted. Starr H. Arvay shall provide a copy of this Order to Defendants. Defendan ts have until 02/20/09 to retain new counsel. The Clerk shall add the last known address of Defendants to the docket. It is Recommended that the 967 Motion to Adjudicate Attorney's Lien be denied. Objections to R&R due by 2/7/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 01/22/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK) .
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER Granting in part 809 Motion to Set Aside, as follows: that the Clerks Entry of Default (#801) is hereby VACATED and service of process is QUASHED only as to Defendant Fusheng Liu. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall mail another copy of the Summons and Complaint to Fusheng Lius San Marino home address through the post office. ORDERED that Plaintiff may serve process by publication in accord with Nev. R. Civ. P. 4(e)(1). Publication will only be required in a local Nevada newspape r because Defendants already have actual notice of these proceedings. Therefore, the publication shall run once a week, in the Las Vegas Review-Journal or Las Vegas Sun for a period of four weeks. This will constitute service on the Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Fusheng Lius answer is due twenty (20) days after service of process is completed. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 2/4/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV v. KXD Technology, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?