MDL 1735 - In RE: Wal-Mart Wage & Hour Employment Practices Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Nancy Hall, Reginald Paul Jackson, Phil Ankenman, Bryan Trenkle, Danny Christy, John McFarlin, Tammy Poha, Moke K. Palakiko, Davelyn M. Paaoao-Sako, John Luce, Dora Jackson, Anthony Woods, Rebecca Cole, Hazel Stafford, Norma Jean Williams, Mark W. Curless, Nola Gilles, Sadie Kuwamoto, Kara Raney, Tammie Grey, Cathy Ann Olinger, Travis Williams, Carolyn Penn, Eric Penn, Izet Husidic, Tina Koenen, Janet Nolan, Bonnie Newill, Nina M. Ossler, Lori Kraemer, Shirley Jean Evans, Sherry Richardson, Barbara Lynn Whitacre, Erica Bayardo, Pam Brogan, Jane Markins, Francis Gail Patterson, Theresa Pedro, Francis Betters, Shannon Phelps, Christopher Dale Hanneken, Adriana M. Smith, Jason Hicks, Shanaia Brown and Robert J. King
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Sam's East, Inc., Sam's Wholesale Club, Wal-Mart Stores, East, Inc. and Walmart Retirement Plans Committee
Case Number: 2:2006cv00225
Filed: February 27, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 869 ORDER Granting 861 Motion for Documents Filed Under Seal and to Confirm Inclusion in Transmitted Record on Appeal. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall unseal Docket Nos. 677 , 680 , 683 , 684 , and 686 . FURTHER ORDERED that Docket Nos. 661, 676, and 679 shall remain under seal. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk may provide copies of Docket Nos. 661, 676, and 679 to any Plaintiffs' counsel who requests such copies for purposes of preparing briefs in the appeal currently pending before the United State Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 866 ORDER Denying 858 Emergency Motion to Enforce This Courts Injunction; for Contempt and for Monetary Sanctions. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/7/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 865 ORDER that any party wishing to respond to the 861 Emergency MOTION Request to Unseal Documents shall file a Response by 8/10/2012. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 859 ORDER that any party wishing to respond to 858 Emergency MOTION for Sanctions by the Mills Law Firm and Carol P. LaPlant to Enforce this Court's Injunction; for Contempt and for Monetary Sanctions shall file a response on or before 8/9/2012. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/30/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ORDER that the stay previously entered by this Court on March 30, 2012 831 is hereby extended pending resolution of the appeal in this matter. Denying as moot 844 Motion Request for Guidance in Light of Recent Filings by Plaintiffs Counsel. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/21/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 847 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 828 Motion for Appeal Bond for Carol LaPlant. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/14/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER that the Emergency Motion for Stay of Enforcement of Judgment 826 is hereby GRANTED to the limited extent that Bonsignore and Brewer and its agents, servants, employees, assigns, attorneys, and persons in active concert or participation with them are hereby temporarily enjoined from attempting to execute on the Judgment obtained in this action, either directly or through enforcement of a registered foreign judgment, pending this Courts resolution of whether to grant a stay pending appea l and any associated bond issues. Any interested party who has filed an appeal in this action shall respond to Bonsignore and Brewers request that a bond be posted or the stay of execution be lifted on or before April 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/30/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER Denying 812 Mr. Kevin Pollin's Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 810 JUDGMENT is entered confirming 779 Arbitrator's Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER Granting 722 Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel Robert Bonsignore's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 737 Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel Carolyn Beasley Burton, Robert Mills, and Carol P. LaPlant's Motion to Vacate Arbitrators Ruling is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 786 Robert Bonsignore's Motion to Strike or Allow Response is GRANTED. The Court will consider the proposed sur-reply.. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/11/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER that 722 Notice of Allocation Order and Request for Court Order Instructing Claims Administrator to Release Payment of Attorneys' Fees to Plaintiffs' Class Counsels is DENIED to the extent it seeks an immediate distribution of fund s from the Qualified Settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will treat 722 Notice of Allocation as a Motion to Confirm the Arbitration Award. Oppositions due 4/11/11. Replies due 4/26/11. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 731 Motion to Strike, 732 Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal, and 735 Motion for Hearing are all DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ORDER that Mr. Felder's letter is referred to counsel for Plaintiff for purposes of providing an appropriate response to Mr. Felder. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 687 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/2/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER that the Unopposed Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal, for In Camera Review, Notice of Opinion and Order and Declaration Issued by Honorable Layn R. Phillips 656 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall submit the referenced documents to chambers for in camera review. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/17/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 653 ORDER Granting 646 Co-Lead Counsel Carolyn Beasley Burton's Motion to File Under Seal, for In Camera Review, Motion to Disqualify Layn R. Phillips. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Co-Lead Counsel Burton immediately shall provide copies of the mot ion and supporting documents to Plaintiffs' co-counsel only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' co-counsel shall file any responses to motion to disqualify on or before 6/23/10. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Motion Hearing is set for 6/25/2010 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Philip M. Pro. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/14/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER Adopting the analysis set forth in Plaintiffs co-lead class counsel Memoranda ( 639 and 640 ), the Court finds that each of the four Objectors, and their counsel, jointly and severely, shall pay to the Plaintiffs Settlement Fund the sum of & #036;200 per day for each of the intervening days between March 30, 2010 and May 18, 2010, or a total of $10,000 as to each Objector and their counsel as a sanction for their failure to comply withthis Courts Order 613 of March 8, 2009. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED Denying 625 and 636 Objectors Motion and Amended Motion to Stay., Denying 629 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Objectors Notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Objectors/Appellants Jessica Lynn Gaona, Stephanie Swift, Deborah Maddox and Fatima Andrews shall have to and including June 3, 2010 within which to fully comply with this Courts Order of March 8, 2010 613 by posting the required appeal bond in the amount of $500,000 on behalf of each of the four Objectors. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 5/25/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SD)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER Granting 535 , 541 , 549 , 566 , 586 Motions for Bond; and Granting 539 Motion for Bond(see order for details). Granting 585 Motion to exceed page limit. Denying 592 Motion for Sanctions. Denying 595 Motion for Sanctions. Denying 601 Motion to Strike. Denying 605 Motion for Sanctions. Court will entertain no further motions for fees/costs. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/8/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MDL 1735 - In RE: Wal-Mart Wage & Hour Employment Practices Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hall
Represented By: Dirk A Ravenholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Paul Jackson
Represented By: Nathan R. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Ankenman
Represented By: Nathan R. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Trenkle
Represented By: Nathan R. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Christy
Represented By: Nathan R. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McFarlin
Represented By: Carol P LaPlant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Poha
Represented By: Laurent J. Remillard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moke K. Palakiko
Represented By: Laurent J. Remillard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davelyn M. Paaoao-Sako
Represented By: Laurent J. Remillard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Luce
Represented By: Matthew T. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dora Jackson
Represented By: Gary S. Nitsche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Woods
Represented By: Samuel K. Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Cole
Represented By: Cynthia K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hazel Stafford
Represented By: James R. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Jean Williams
Represented By: Glen W. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark W. Curless
Represented By: Laurence William Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nola Gilles
Represented By: Fred Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sadie Kuwamoto
Represented By: Fred Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Raney
Represented By: Fred Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammie Grey
Represented By: Royce Deryl Edwards, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Ann Olinger
Represented By: Daniel D. Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Williams
Represented By: Craig O. Asbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Penn
Represented By: Vincent J Glorioso, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Penn
Represented By: Vincent J Glorioso, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Izet Husidic
Represented By: John J Rausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Koenen
Represented By: John J Rausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Nolan
Represented By: J. Thomas Henretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Newill
Represented By: J. Thomas Henretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina M. Ossler
Represented By: J. Thomas Henretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Kraemer
Represented By: Stacey E. Tjon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Jean Evans
Represented By: Pamela R Mullis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Richardson
Represented By: Mark A Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Lynn Whitacre
Represented By: Donald S Goldbloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Bayardo
Represented By: Jill P. Telfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pam Brogan
Represented By: Troy N Giatras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Markins
Represented By: Troy N Giatras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Gail Patterson
Represented By: Troy N Giatras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Pedro
Represented By: Adriana Contartese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Betters
Represented By: Adriana Contartese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Phelps
Represented By: Lanny H. Darr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dale Hanneken
Represented By: Lanny H. Darr, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adriana M. Smith
Represented By: Jay A. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Hicks
Represented By: Thomas Henry Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanaia Brown
Represented By: Daniel E. Rausher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. King
Represented By: Ellen T. Noteware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Represented By: James E Whitmire, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Wholesale Club
Represented By: Eric J Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, Inc.
Represented By: James E Whitmire, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Retirement Plans Committee
Represented By: Deena Jo Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?