1st Technology LLC v. IQ-Ludorum, PLC, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: 1st Technology LLC
Defendant: Kolyma Corporation, A.V.V. and Tiltware LLC
Counter Claimant: Tiltware LLC
Counter Defendant: 1st Technology LLC
Case Number: 2:2006cv00323
Filed: March 15, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2007 Filing 65
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Wendy Kemp Akbar, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 693776) by Defendant Tiltware LLC. (McCue, Michael)
September 20, 2007 Filing 64
ANSWER to 63 Counterclaim by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC.(Rath, Luke)
August 31, 2007 Filing 63
ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against 1st Technology LLC by Defendant Tiltware LLC, Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/10/2007. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/15/2007.(McCue, Michael)
August 17, 2007 Filing 62
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 8/17/2007 before Judge Lloyd D. George. Crtrm Administrator: Judy Harris; Pla Counsel: Luke Kristopher Rath with Mr. Matthew g. McAndrews on telephone; Def Counsel: John Krieger with Mr. Charles W. Jirauch on the telephone; Court Reporter/FTR #: Denise Saavedra, ECRO; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m.. The Court grants the withdrawing 14 of the motion to transfer made by Mr. Jirauch. Parties are to file all their documents with a courtesy copy to the chambers of the Court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JJH)
August 16, 2007 Filing 61
STATUS REPORT of Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC In Advance of August 17, 2007 Status Conference by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
August 10, 2007 Filing 58
NOTICE by Defendant Tiltware LLC Notice of Appearance of Charles W. Jirauch, Esq. (McCue, Michael)
June 14, 2007 Filing 57
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 6/14/2007 before Judge Lloyd D. George. Crtrm Administrator: Judy Harris; Pla Counsel: Kristopher Rath and Matt McAndrews; Def Counsel: Jim Berchtold; Court Reporter/FTR #: Denise Saavedra, ECRO; Time of Hearing: 10:35 a.m.. For the reasons stated IT IS ORDERED the Court set a continued Status Conference for FRIDAY, AUGUST 17, 2007 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6B before Judge Lloyd D. George. (JJH)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56
ORDER granting 54 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew G. McAndrews for 1st Media and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 5/30/07. (AXM)
May 29, 2007 Filing 54
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Matthew G. McAndrews, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 575747) by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
May 16, 2007 Filing 52
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 5/16/2007 before Judge Lloyd D. George. Crtrm Administrator: Judy Harris; Pla Counsel: Kristopher Rath and Mr. Matt McAndres on telephone to listen only; Def Counsel: John Krieger; Tiltware LLC; Court Reporter/FTR #: Denise Saavedra, ECRO; Time of Hearing: 11:30 a.m.. After representations are made to the Court IT IS ORDERED that the parties are to deliver within the next two days, copies of all filings in this matter by courtesy copy to the chamber of Lloyd D. George. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that another Status Conference was set for: THURSDAY, JUNE 14, 2007 at 10:30 a.m. in LV courtroom 6B before Judge Lloyd d. George. (JJH)
March 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50
ORDER granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. William W. Flachsbart withdrawn from the case. Signed by Judge Robert J. Johnston on 3/20/2007. (MXS )
March 5, 2007 Filing 49
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by William W. Flachsbart. by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
November 14, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 45
ORDER granting Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to IQ-Ludorum PLC only. Each party to bear their own fees/costs. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 11/13/06. (KCR)
November 13, 2006 Filing 44
REPLY to Response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE; filed by Defendant Tiltware LLC. Reply to Plaintiff's Supplemental Opposition (McCue, Michael)
October 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 40
ORDER granting 37 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Opposition to 14 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative, for Transfer of Venue. Responses due by 11/3/2006. Replies due by 11/13/2006. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 10/26/06. (MJZ)
October 16, 2006 Filing 38
RESPONSE to 37 MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Support of its Opposition to Defendant Tiltware, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue or, in the alternative, for Transfer of Venue; filed by Defendant Tiltware LLC. Replies due by 10/30/2006. (McCue, Michael)
September 19, 2006 Filing 36
NOTICE by Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC Notice of Change of Firm Name (Trimmer, Paul)
August 22, 2006 Filing 34
DESIGNATION of Local Counsel 31 is APPROVED for Luke Rath. Signed by Lance S Wilson on 8/22/06. (AXM)
August 15, 2006 Filing 31
DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Admitted To The Bar Of The Court And Consent Thereto by Luke Kristopher Rath on behalf of Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
August 10, 2006 Filing 29
DESIGNATION of Local Counsel by Joanna S. Kishner, William M. Gantz, Paul T. Trimmer on behalf of Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC. (MAJ)
August 7, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 28
ORDER granting 26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William M. Gantz for IQ-Ludorum PLC. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 8/7/06. (MAJ)
August 2, 2006 Filing 27
DESIGNATION of Local Counsel by Paul T. Trimmer on behalf of Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC. (Trimmer, Paul)
August 1, 2006 Filing 25
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC. Responses due by 8/19/2006. (Trimmer, Paul)
July 25, 2006 Filing 23
STIPULATION re 18 Order on Stipulation, 17 Stipulation, 20 Stipulation, 21 Order on Stipulation; Stipulation and Request to Extend Time for Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC. (Trimmer, Paul)
July 21, 2006 Filing 22
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC, Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC. IQ-Ludorum PLC served on 5/24/2006, answer due 6/13/2006. (Rath, Luke)
July 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21
ORDER ON STIPULATION re 20 Stipulation for time to respond to complaint. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 7/17/06. (AXM)
July 14, 2006 Filing 20
STIPULATION re 18 Order on Stipulation, 17 Stipulation; Stipulation and Request to Extend Time for Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC. (Trimmer, Paul)
July 3, 2006 Filing 19
REPLY to Response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss FOR IMPROPER VENUE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE; filed by Defendant Tiltware LLC. (McCue, Michael)
June 30, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 18
ORDER ON STIPULATION re 17 Stipulation. Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC has until July 18, 2006 to answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 6/29/06. (VHM, )
June 23, 2006 Filing 17
STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, ; Stipulation and Request to Extend Time for Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant IQ-Ludorum PLC. (Trimmer, Paul)
June 19, 2006 Filing 15
ERROR: Wrong event selected. Attorney notified to refile document by email. Modified on 6/22/2006 (GEW).
May 19, 2006 Filing 13
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC, Defendant Tiltware LLC. Tiltware LLC served on 4/10/2006, answer due 4/30/2006. (Rath, Luke)
April 6, 2006 Filing 9
SUMMONS Issued as to Tiltware LLC. (GEW)
April 4, 2006 Filing 8
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Summons In A Civil Action, filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
March 27, 2006 Filing 5
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Summons In A Civil Action, filed by Plaintiff 1st Technology LLC. (Rath, Luke)
March 16, 2006 Filing 3
AO 120/121 Trademark & Patent Form mailed to Patent Office with copy of complaint. (GEW)
March 15, 2006 Filing 4
ERROR: Document filed twice. Modified on 3/23/2006 (GEW).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1st Technology LLC v. IQ-Ludorum, PLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1st Technology LLC
Represented By: Luke Kristopher Rath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kolyma Corporation, A.V.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiltware LLC
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Tiltware LLC
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: 1st Technology LLC
Represented By: Luke Kristopher Rath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?