Holmquist et al v. Exotic Cars at Caesars Palace, LLC et al
Plaintiff: James A. Holmquist and Scott A. White
Defendant: Richard Weisman and Exotic Cars at Caesars Palace, LLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv00298
Filed: March 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER re 176 Motion to Enforce Judgment/Arrest Defendant/Judgment Debtor Richard L. Weisman. Briefs due by 10/31/2017. Disclosure, Affidavit, and Notification due by 11/17/2017. Hearing set for 11/29/2019 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER Granting 186 Stipulation to Extend Time re 176 MOTION to Enforce Judgment to Arrest Richard Weisman and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 184 James M. Gerber, Esq. and Shawn M. Perry, Esq.'s Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall remove David A. Colvin, Esq. from the CM/ECF service list in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Granting 181 Stipulation to Extend Time re 176 MOTION to Enforce Judgment to Arrest Richard Weisman and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. ( Responses due by 7/31/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holmquist et al v. Exotic Cars at Caesars Palace, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Holmquist
Represented By: Shawn M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott A. White
Represented By: Shawn M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Weisman
Represented By: SARAH STROEBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exotic Cars at Caesars Palace, LLC
Represented By: SARAH STROEBEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?