Greene v. McDaniel (DEATH PENALTY)
Petitioner: Travers A. Greene
Respondent: Catherine Cortez Masto and E. K. McDaniel
Case Number: 2:2007cv00304
Filed: March 9, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Roger L. Hunt
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Granting 186 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time (Third Request) re 119 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents will have until and including January 20, 2023, to file their answer. Petitioner will then have 180 days to fil e a reply to the answer. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 11/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Granting 184 Motion to Extend Time to File answer to 119 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner will then have 180 days to file a reply to the answer. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set fort h in the order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Renee Baker answer due 11/21/2022; Aaron Ford answer due 11/21/2022; William Reubart answer due 11/21/2022. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 9/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Granting 181 Motion to Extend Time to file answer re 119 amended petition. Petitioner will then have 180 days to file a reply to the answer. Renee Baker answer due 9/20/2022. Aaron Ford answer due 9/20/2022. William Gittere answer due 9/20/2022. E.K. McDaniel answer due 9/20/2022. Signed by District Judge Cristina D. Silva on 5/25/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDERED that Respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 129 ) is granted in part and denied in part. The claims in Petitioner's second amended habeas petition (ECF No. 119 as detailed herein are dismissed. Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery (ECF No. 164 ) is denied. Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing (ECF No. 167 ) is denied. Respondents shall, within 180 days from the date of this order (5/21/2022), file an answer, responding to the remaining claims in Petitioner's Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 119 ). The time for Petitioner to file a reply to Respondents' answer, as set forth in the December 6, 2019, scheduling order (ECF No. 113 ), will be extended to 180 days. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the December 6, 2019, scheduling order (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting ECF No. 175 Motion to Extend Time : Greene's Replies re ECF Nos. 164 Motion for dsicovery, 167 Motion motion for hearing, due by 10/11/2021. It is further ordered that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER - Respondents' motion for extension of time (ECF No. 170 ) is granted. Respondents will have until and including September 7, 2021, to file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss, their response to Petitioner 9;s motion for leave to conduct discovery, and their response to Petitioner's motion for evidentiary hearing. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/30/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting ECF No. 168 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have until and including August 6, 2021, to file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss, their response to Petitioner's motion for leave to conduct discovery, and their response to Petitioner's motion for evidentiary hearing. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting ECF No. 160 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner will have until and including June 7, 2021, to respond to the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 129 ). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. 127 ) : Answer/response to ECF No. 119 Second amended petition due bt 3/9/2021. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting ECF No. 125 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have until and including December 4, 2020, to file an answer or other response to the Second Amended Petition (ECF No. 119 ). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER that Respondents' motion for extension of time (ECF No. 123 ) is granted. Respondents will have until and including October 5, 2020, to file an answer or other response to Petitioner's second amended habeas petition. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ), will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER - Respondents' Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 121 ) is granted. Respondents will have until and including September 4, 2020, to file an answer or other response to Petitioner's Second Amended Habeas Petition (ECF No. 119 ). In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the Order entered December 6, 2019 (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDERED that Petitioner's motion for extension of time (ECF No. 116 ) is granted. Petitioner will have until and including May 6, 2020, to file his second amended habeas petition. It is further ordered that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019, (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting ECF No. 114 Motion to Extend Time : Second Amended Petition due by 4/6/2020. It is further ordered that, in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered December 6, 2019, (ECF No. 113 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Stay and Reopen Capital Habeas Proceedings (ECF No. 110 ) is granted. The stay of this action is lifted. It is further ordered that the following schedule will govern the further proceedings in this a ction: 1. Amended Petition. Petitioner will have 60 days from the date of this order to file a second amended petition for writ of habeas corpus (2/4/2020)<BR. 2. Response to Petition. Respondents will have 60 days following the filing of the second amended petition to file an answer or other response to the second amended petition. 3. Reply and Response to Reply. Petitioner will have 45 days following the filing of an answer to file a reply. Respondents will thereafter have 30 da ys following the filing of a reply to file a response to the reply. (See pdf order for additional subsequent deadlines.) William Gittere is substituted for Timothy Filson as the Respondent Warden, and Aaron Ford is substituted for Adam Paul L axalt as the Respondent State Attorney General. The Clerk of the Court is directed to update the docket for this case to reflect these changes. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDERED that petitioner's Motion to Temporarily Lift Stay to Supplement Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 99 ) is granted. Petitioner is granted leave of court to add to his habeas corpus petition in this action the claim set forth in his Supplement to Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 100 ). The stay of this action will remain in effect. Clerk shall substitute Timothy Filson for Renee Baker, on the docket, and will update the caption of the action to reflect this change. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDERDenying 52 Motion for Leave. Denying 28 Motion to Dismiss. Granting 65 Motion to Stay. Status Report due every 6 months (6/15/2009). Following state-court case, petitioner shall file motion in 30 days to lift stay. Signed by Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt on 2/6/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. McDaniel (DEATH PENALTY)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Travers A. Greene
Represented By: David S. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine Cortez Masto
Represented By: Dennis C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E. K. McDaniel
Represented By: Dennis C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?