Bobadilla et al v. Roanoke Companies Group, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Deborah Teaford, Jose Polanco, David Bridges, Sandra Bobadilla, Juliet Cerezo, Dennis Cerezo, Diane Clarke, Misty Stevenson, Monica Freeman, Michael Grimes, Robert Carlson, Ida Stratton, Jeffrey Williams, Chad Stevens and Peggy Tucker
Defendant: Roanoke Companies Group, Inc., SLR, Inc., Aerofil Technology, Inc., BRTT, Innovative Chemical Technologies, Inc., Ortec, Inc. and Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00344
Filed: March 19, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Lawrence R Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #61 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
August 23, 2011 Filing 62 NOTICE by Plaintiff Sandra Bobadilla (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, #2 Exhibit Notice of Electronic Filing Re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal)(Harris, Richard)
August 19, 2011 Filing 61 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice of Roanoke Companies Group, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., SLR, Inc., Aerofil Technologies, Inc., Innovative Chemical Technologies, Inc. and Ortect Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) filed by Plaintiffs Sandra Bobadilla, David Bridges, Robert Carlson, Dennis Cerezo, Juliet Cerezo, Diane Clarke, Monica Freeman, Michael Grimes, Jose Polanco, Chad Stevens, Misty Stevenson, Ida Stratton, Deborah Teaford, Peggy Tucker, Jeffrey Williams. (Harris, Richard)
July 26, 2011 Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 7/26/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: #41 Status Report, filed November 8, 2010. Plaintiff's counsel represented that all Plaintiffs had settled with all Defendants in this matter. To date, the Court has received stipulations and orders to dismiss with regard to the following Plaintiffs: Robert Carlson,Dennis and Juliet Cerezo, Michael Grimes, Jose Polanco and Jeffrey Williams. Compromise of minor's claims with regard to Plaintiff Misty Stevenson has been completed, with the establishment of blocked accounts. Plaintiff is to file a Status Report by 8/5/2011 indicating the progress as to settlement with remaining parties. Counsel are to file the stipulations to dismiss with regard to Misty Stevenson by that date. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 14, 2011 Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 7/14/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. The Court, having received proof that blocked accounts have been established for the minors, VACATES the status conference set for 7/19/2011 at 9:00 AM. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
July 13, 2011 Filing 58 STATEMENT of Hailey Stevenson Proof of Establishment of Blocked Account by Plaintiff Misty Stevenson. (Harris, Richard)
July 13, 2011 Filing 57 STATEMENT of Gavin Stevenson Proof of Establishment of Blocked Account by Plaintiff Misty Stevenson. (Harris, Richard)
July 7, 2011 Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 7/7/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Status Conference set for 7/12/2011 at 9:00 AM is reset to 7/19/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. The hearing may be vacated by the filing of proof of blocked accounts. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 22, 2011 Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 6/22/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. To allow Plaintiff's counsel more time to establish the minor's blocked accounts, the Status Conference set for 6/24/2011 at 9:00 AM is reset to 7/12/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ON STIPULATION re #53 Stipulation. Status Conference set for 6/20/2011 at 9:00 AM is reset to 6/24/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
June 7, 2011 Filing 53 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order by Defendant Roanoke Companies Group, Inc.. (McCrea-Hanlon, Carrie)
June 7, 2011 Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 6/7/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Status Conference set for 6/8/2011 at 9:00 AM is reset to 6/20/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Hearing may be vacated upon the filing of proof of blocked accounts. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #46 Motion Compromise of Minor's Claim as to Hailey Stevenson. See order for specifics. Status Conference set for 6/8/2011 at 9:00 AM. This hearing will be vacated upon proof of compliance with the conditions outlined in the order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/3/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #45 Motion Compromise of Minor's Claim. See order for specifics. Status Conference set for 6/8/2011 at 9:00 AM. This hearing will be vacated upon proof of compliance with the conditions outlined in the order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/3/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
May 3, 2011 Filing 49 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2011 before Judge Kent J. Dawson. Crtrm Administrator: Peggie Vannozzi; Pla Counsel: Kerry Earley; Def Counsel: Nadin Cutter; Court Reporter/FTR #: Denise Saavedra; Time of Hearing: 9:07 AM-9:15 AM; Courtroom: 6D; The Court asks Ms. Earley questions regarding the medical records of the minors. The Court makes findings for the record and GRANTS 43 Motion for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Gavin Stevenson by Plaintiff Misty Stevenson and 44 Motion for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Hailey Stevenson by Plaintiff Sandra Bobadilla. The Court signs the proposed orders. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 14, 2011 Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 4/14/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that the Hearing on 44 MOTION Petition for compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Hailey Stevenson and 43 MOTION Petition for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Gavin Stevenson was incorrectly set for 5/2/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. The correct hearing date is 5/3/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
April 14, 2011 Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 4/14/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. RE: 44 MOTION Petition for compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Hailey Stevenson, 43 MOTION Petition for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Gavin Stevenson. Motion Hearing on 44 MOTION Petition for compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Hailey Stevenson and 43 MOTION Petition for Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Gavin Stevenson is set for 5/2/2011 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Kent J. Dawson.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
March 25, 2011 Filing 46 MOTION Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Hailey Stevenson by Plaintiff Sandra Bobadilla. Responses due by 4/11/2011. (Harris, Richard)
March 25, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim of Minor Gavin Stevenson by Plaintiff Sandra Bobadilla. Responses due by 4/11/2011. (Harris, Richard)
February 7, 2011 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 2/7/2011. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Status Report or stipulation to dismiss is due by 2/18/2011.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 8, 2010 Filing 41 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Sandra Bobadilla. (Harris, Richard)
November 3, 2010 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson, on 11/3/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Peggie Vannozzi. Status Report due by 11/19/2010.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #37 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael P. Turiello and approving Attorney Carrie McCrea Hanlon as Designation of Local Counsel for Roanoke Companies Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/9/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #36 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward B. Ruff and approving Attorney Carrie McCrea Hanlon as Designation of Local Counsel for Roanoke Companies Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 8/9/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 5, 2010 Filing 37 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael P. Turiello, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Carrie McCrea Hanlon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1698028) filed by Defendant Roanoke Companies Group, Inc. Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in This Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of This Court and Designation of Local Counsel. Motion ripe 8/5/2010. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McCrea-Hanlon, Carrie)
August 5, 2010 Filing 36 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Edward B. Ruff, III, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Carrie McCrea Hanlon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1697876) filed by Defendant Roanoke Companies Group, Inc. Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in This Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of This Court and Designation of Local Counsel. Motion ripe 8/5/2010. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McCrea-Hanlon, Carrie)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #34 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice of Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc. and Roanoke Companies Group, Inc without costs against either party. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 7/19/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
July 16, 2010 Filing 34 STIPULATION and Consent Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Roanoke Companies Group, Inc., and Home Depot U.S.A., INC., Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) by Plaintiff Sandra Bobadilla. (Harris, Richard) Modified to remove all caps on 7/19/2010 (RFJ).
June 30, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonathan M Menuez on behalf of Defendant Aerofil Technology, Inc.. (Menuez, Jonathan)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CONSENT ORDER of Dismissal in favor of Plaintiffs and against Aerofil Technology, Inc., Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc., and Roanoke Companies Group, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #28 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James Popson and approving Attorney Tod R. Dubow as Designation of Local Counsel for Aerofil Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/18/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #27 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan Menuez and approving Attorney Tod R. Dubow as Designation of Local Counsel for Aerofil Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/18/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
June 18, 2010 Filing 29 STIPULATION and Consent Order of Dismissal with Prejudice of Roanoke Companies Group, Inc., Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., and Aerofil Technologies, Inc., Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) by Plaintiff Sandra Bobadilla. (Harris, Richard) Modified to remove all caps on 6/22/2010 (RFJ).
June 17, 2010 Filing 28 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James Popson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tod R. Dubow (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1646989) filed by Defendant Aerofil Technology, Inc.. Motion ripe 6/17/2010. (Odou, Joel)
June 17, 2010 Filing 27 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Menuez and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tod R. Dubow (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1646962) filed by Defendant Aerofil Technology, Inc.. Motion ripe 6/17/2010. (Odou, Joel)
June 11, 2010 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Denise A Dickerson on behalf of Defendant Aerofil Technology, Inc.. (Dickerson, Denise)
May 17, 2010 Filing 25 (1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Denise A. Dickerson is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (LMC)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #21 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas H Terry, III and approving Attorney Joel D. Odou as Designation of Local Counsel for Aerofil Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/14/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting #22 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Denise A. Dickerson and approving Attorney Joel D. Odou as Designation of Local Counsel for Aerofil Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/14/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 12, 2010 Filing 22 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Denise A. Dickerson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joel D. Odou (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1607768) filed by Defendant Aerofil Technology, Inc.. Motion ripe 5/12/2010. (Odou, Joel)
May 12, 2010 Filing 21 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Thomas H. Terry, III and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joel D. Odou (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1607724) filed by Defendant Aerofil Technology, Inc.. Motion ripe 5/12/2010. (Odou, Joel)
March 29, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Joel D. Odou on behalf of Defendant Aerofil Technology, Inc.. (Odou, Joel)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Seslee S Mattson and approving Attorney Carrie McCrae Hanlon as Designation of Local Counsel for Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/12/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John P MacNaughton and approving Attorney Carrie McCrae Hanlon as Designation of Local Counsel for Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/12/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 10, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiff Sandra Bobadilla Regarding SLR Bankruptcy (Earley, Kerry)
February 24, 2010 Filing 16 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John P. MacNaughton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Carrie McCrea Hanlon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1529428) filed by Defendants Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc., Roanoke Companies Group, Inc. Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in This Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of This Court and Designation of Local Counsel. Motion ripe 2/24/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McCrea-Hanlon, Carrie)
February 24, 2010 Filing 15 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Seslee S. Mattson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Carrie McCrea Hanlon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1529399) filed by Defendants Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc., Roanoke Companies Group, Inc. Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in This Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of This Court and Designation of Local Counsel. Motion ripe 2/24/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McCrea-Hanlon, Carrie)
February 22, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carrie McCrea-Hanlon on behalf of Defendants Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc., Roanoke Companies Group, Inc.. Notice of Appearance (McCrea-Hanlon, Carrie)
January 28, 2010 Filing 13 Certified Copy of #12 MDL Conditional Remand Order. (EDS)
January 25, 2010 Filing 12 MDL Conditional Remand Order Signed by MDL on 1/22/10. (Attachments: #1 letter)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CC ORDER for CTO-3 Transfer to Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge MDL M MDL. (Attachments: #1)(AXM)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-3). This case is transferred to the Northern District of Georgia and assigned to the Honorable Thomas W. Thrash, Jr., case #07-cv-1037. Signed by MDL Panel on 4/30/07. (MAJ)
March 29, 2007 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Plaintiffs Dennis Cerezo, Juliet Cerezo, Diane Clarke, Monica Freeman, Michael Grimes, Jose Polanco, Chad Stevens, Misty Stevenson, Sandra Bobadilla, Ida Stratton, Deborah Teaford, Peggy Tucker, Jeffrey Williams, David Bridges, Robert Carlson. (Harris, Richard)
March 20, 2007 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Ortec, Inc. (MJZ)
March 20, 2007 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Innovative Chemical Technologies, Inc. (MJZ)
March 20, 2007 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Aerofil Technology, Inc. (MJZ)
March 20, 2007 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to SLR, Inc. (MJZ)
March 20, 2007 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc. (MJZ)
March 20, 2007 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Roanoke Companies Group, Inc. (MJZ)
March 20, 2007 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Roanoke Companies Group, Inc. (MJZ)
March 19, 2007 Case assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Lawrence R. Leavitt. (MJZ)
March 19, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Roanoke Companies Group, Inc.(now known as BRTT, INC.), AEROFIL TECHNOLOGY, INC., Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc., INNOVATIVE CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ORTEC, INC., Roanoke Companies Group, Inc.(Individually and as Successor in Interest to ROANOKE COMPANIES GROUP, INC.), SLR, INC. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 513599), filed by Dennis Cerezo, Juliet cerezo, Diane Clarke, Monica freeman, Michael grimes, Jose polanco, chad stevens, Misty Stevenson, Misty Stevenson(As Next Friend of G.S., a minor), Misty Stevenson(As Next Friend of H.S., a minor), Sandra Bobadilla, Ida Stratton, Deborah Teaford, Peggy Tucker, Jeffrey Williams, Sandra Bobadilla, David Bridges, Robert Carlson. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/29/2007. (Attachments: #1 Complaint pgs 8-16#2 Complaint pgs 17-23#3 #4 #5 #6 #7 #8 #9 #10)(Harris, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bobadilla et al v. Roanoke Companies Group, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roanoke Companies Group, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie McCrea Hanlon
Represented By: Michael P. Turiello
Represented By: Edward B. Ruff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLR, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerofil Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Represented By: Denise A Dickerson
Represented By: Thomas H Terry, III
Represented By: Jonathan M Menuez
Represented By: Tod R. Dubow
Represented By: James M Popson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRTT
Represented By: Carrie McCrea Hanlon
Represented By: Michael P. Turiello
Represented By: Edward B. Ruff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Chemical Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot, U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Seslee S Mattson
Represented By: Carrie McCrea Hanlon
Represented By: John P MacNaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Teaford
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Polanco
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bridges
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bobadilla
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Represented By: Kerry L Earley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juliet Cerezo
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Cerezo
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Clarke
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Stevenson
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Freeman
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Grimes
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carlson
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Stratton
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Williams
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Stevens
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Tucker
Represented By: Richard A Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?