Federal Trade Commission v. Ewing et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Crystal A. Ewing, David F. Ewing, Consumer Direct Enterprises LLC, Top Choice, Inc., Classic Productions LLC and Response Processing LLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv00479
Filed: April 11, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CONSENT JUDGMENT, Final Judgment, Order for Compensatory Contempt Relief, and Modified Order For Permanent Injunction and Other Equitable Relief as to Crystal Ewing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Admit Consumer Complaints. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the Court will treat 27 Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission's Reply to Defendants Objection to the Admission of Consumer Complaints Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 807 as a motion. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Crystal Ewing shall file any response she deems necessary on or before October 1, 2014.FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission shall file any reply it deems necessary on or before October 8, 2014. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 9/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Continue District Judge Hearing. Motion Hearing reset for 10/20/2014 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Philip M. Pro re 11 MOTION Finding of Contempt and Coercive Sanctions Against Crystal Ewing< /i> filed by Federal Trade Commission. Deadline for the FTCs supplemental submission in support of compensatory relief July 30, 2014. Deadline for the Defendants response to the FTCs submissions August 20, 2014. Deadline for the FTCs reply September 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney Alejandro Rosenberg and Korin Ewing Felix for Federal Trade Commission. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Ewing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal A. Ewing
Represented By: Sean K. McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David F. Ewing
Represented By: Sean K. McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Direct Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Sean K. McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Choice, Inc.
Represented By: Sean K. McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Productions LLC
Represented By: Sean K. McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Response Processing LLC
Represented By: Sean K. McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?