Picus v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Maragaret Picus
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc., Chemnutra, Inc., Del Monte Foods Company, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Sunshine Mills, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00682
Filed: May 25, 2007
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2009 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The 58 Motion to Deny Class Certification is Granted. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 03/16/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
October 12, 2007 46
NOTICE of Change of Address by Nicholas M Wieczorek. (Wieczorek, Nicholas)
October 11, 2007 45
NOTICE by Plaintiff Maragaret Picus of Change of Firm Name (Gerard, Robert)
September 28, 2007 44
OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF RECENT AND SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Salerno, Nicholas)
September 24, 2007 43
NOTICE by Plaintiff Maragaret Picus re 18 MOTION to Dismiss, 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. Notice of New and Supplemental Authority Submitted in Opposition to motions to dismiss (Blumenthal, Norman)
September 19, 2007 42 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Stay pending a transfer decision by the JPML. Signed by Judge Lawrence R. Leavitt on 9/19/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
September 17, 2007 41
REPLY to Response to 38 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings ; filed by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Salerno, Nicholas)
September 5, 2007 40
RESPONSE to 38 Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings ; filed by Plaintiff Maragaret Picus. and certificate of service (Blumenthal, Norman)
August 28, 2007 38
Emergency MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. (Salerno, Nicholas)
August 14, 2007 34 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting 32 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julie L. Schwartz for Menu Foods, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 08/14/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
August 10, 2007 32
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Alan W. Westbrook submitted by attorney Julie L. Schwartz, (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 641165) by Defendant Menu Foods, Inc.. (Westbrook, Alan)
August 3, 2007 27 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting 26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Norman Blumenthal for Maragaret Picus and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 08/03/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
August 2, 2007 29
MDL-1850 COPY BRIEF in support of Motion 28 filed by Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. re 28 Joint Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order. (Filed by Amy W. Schulman) *No Action Required this will be handled by MDL (BLG)
August 1, 2007 26
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel submitted by attorney Norman Blumenthal, (Filing fee $ 175) by Plaintiff Maragaret Picus. (AXM)
July 27, 2007 25
JOINDER to 24 Reply to Response to Motion ; of Defendant Menu Foods, Inc. to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Defendant Chemnutra, Inc.. (Wieczorek, Nicholas)
July 26, 2007 24
REPLY to Response to 18 MOTION to Dismiss ; filed by Defendant Menu Foods, Inc.. (Westbrook, Alan)
July 5, 2007 20
RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted; filed by Plaintiff Maragaret Picus. PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT DEL MONTE CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT Replies due by 7/19/2007. (Osuch, Lawrence)
June 28, 2007 17
STATUS REPORT Joint by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Boschee, Brian)
June 25, 2007 16
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kurt R. Bonds on behalf of Defendant Sunshine Mills, Inc.. (Bonds, Kurt)
June 21, 2007 9
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to State A Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by Defendant Del Monte Foods Company. Responses due by 7/9/2007. (Grossman, Dawn)
June 20, 2007 8
STIPULATION and Order to Consolidate Cases by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Boschee, Brian)
June 7, 2007 7
STATEMENT of Case by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Boschee, Brian)
May 25, 2007 6
SUPPLEMENT to 5 Notice of Corrected Image/Document; Supplement to Amended Notice or Removal by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Boschee, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picus v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Alan W Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemnutra, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas M Wieczorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Monte Foods Company
Represented By: Nicholas B. Salerno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Brian W Boschee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Mills, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maragaret Picus
Represented By: Norman B Blumenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?