Picus v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Maragaret Picus
Defendant: Del Monte Foods Company, Sunshine Mills, Inc., ChemNutra Inc., Menu Foods Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00686
Filed: May 25, 2007
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Referring Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Stipulation of Dismissal for actions with prejudice. (Case No. 2:07-cv-00682-PMP-LRL, consolidated with Case No. 2:07-cv-00689-PMP-LRL and Case No. 2:07-cv-00686-PMP-LRL) be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 2/1/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
July 24, 2007 12
TRANSMITTAL to MDL Panel. (AXM)
June 21, 2007 9 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER to Consolidate. It is Ordered that 2:07-CV-00686-RLH-RJJ and 2:07-CV-00689-RLH-RJJ are consolidated under 2:07-CV-00682-PMP-LRL. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/21/07. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AAB)
June 6, 2007 8
STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL (Statement Pursuant to Court Order) filed by Defendant ChemNutra Inc.. (Wieczorek, Nicholas)
May 29, 2007 7
NOTE: In accordance with 28:636(c), counsel in the instant action are provided with a copy of the "AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form. Upon consent by all parties, counsel are advised to manually file this form with the Clerk's Office. (MJZ)
May 25, 2007 5
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant ChemNutra Inc.. (Wieczorek, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picus v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maragaret Picus
Represented By: Lawrence T. Osuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Monte Foods Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemNutra Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas M Wieczorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?