Harmon v. Clark County
Plaintiff: Charles Harmon
Defendant: Clark County
Case Number: 2:2008cv00151
Filed: February 5, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Presiding Judge: Lawrence R. Leavitt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re no proposed Joint Pretrial Order having been filed pursuant to 30 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment and allowing the parties an additional 14 days from entry of this order to file a proposed Joint Pretrial Order or risk suffering sanctions. ( Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/22/2010.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/8/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 27 plaintiff's Motion to allow hand filing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall lodge their proposed joint pretrial order within 30 days from entry of this order. See order re specifics. ( Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/12/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER APPROVING 25 parties' Stipulation for an extension of time for Plaintiff to respond to 24 Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment. ( Responses due by 5/26/2009.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/19/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Harmon
Represented By: Richard Segerblom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?