Phase II Chin, LLC et al v. Forum Shops, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Phase II Chin, LLC and Love & Money, LLC
Defendant: Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group, Inc., Caesars Palace Corp. and Caesars Palace Realty Corp.
Case Number: 2:2008cv00162
Filed: February 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: George W Foley
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 409 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 408 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER Denying 362 Motion for Sanctions Against Caesars' Defendants for Spoliation of Evidence. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/24/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER for the Filing of a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 2/22/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/9/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER Denying 360 Motion for Exception of Appearance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER that defendants motion for limited reconsideration of order denying summary judgment against OPM on the issue of OPMs standing to maintain a claim under 42 U.S.C. § 1981 326 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER that Defendants Caesars Palace Corporation and Caesars Palace Realty Corporations Objection to Plaintiff Love & Moneys Supplemental Disclosures 343 is upheld. Carlos Stinson, Tony Poma, Sheila Goodwin, Michael Kostrinsky, Fran Tucker and Greg Jarmolowich are excluded as witnesses in this action and prohibited from testifying at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER that Plaintiff Love & Money, LLCs Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Docs. 343 and 344 355 is granted. Plaintiff shall have until 12/1/10 to respond to documents 343 and 344 . Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 352 STIPULATED ORDER granting an extension of time to respond to supplemental interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/18/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER that Plaintiff Love & Money, LLCs First Motion to Compel Discovery from the Caesars Defendants and for Sanctions 212 is granted in part and denied in part. The Caesars Defendants shall produce the non-privileged material discussed above to P laintiffs on or before 11/8/10. If they have not already done so, the Caesars Defendants shall disclose the unredacted portions of the materials discussed above to Plaintiffs on or before 11/8/10. The Court finds an award of sanctions is not warranted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 297 Motion to Re-Open Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/4/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER DENYING Love & Money LLC's 207 First MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/13/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER that Forum defendants motion to strike jury demand 141 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/30/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 309 AMENDED ORDER that defendants motion to strike 280 is GRANTED as to exhibits K and DD in Plaintiff Love & Money, LLC s opposition to defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developer Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited Partnership and Simo n Property Group Inc.s motion for summary judgment 264 and opposition to defendants Caesars Palace Corporation and Caesars Palace Realty Corporations motion for summary judgment 263 . Defendants motion to strike 279 is DENIED as to exhibits AA, H-1, H-2, H-3, H-4, H-6, H-7, H-8, AA, BB, CC, MM, MM-1 and MM-3. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/23/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER that Caesars Defendants Motion to Seal Selected Exhibits to Plaintiff Love & Moneys Motion to Compel and Caesars Defendants Opposition Thereto 254 is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of the Court shall unseal Plaintiffs Motion t o Compel 212 , Defendants Opposition to the Motion to Compel 229 and Plaintiffs Reply 238 , except for the following exhibits which shall remain sealed: Exhibit C to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel 212 and Exhibit A to Defendants Opposition to Mtn to Compel 229 . Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Deadline. Replies due by 7/2/2010 re 208 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Caesars Palace Corporation. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/1/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER that the Forum Defendants shall produce non-privileged material to Plaintiffs by 6/29/10. The Forum Defendants shall disclose the unredacted portions of materials to Plaintiffs by 6/29/10. The Court will provide the Forum Defendants with examp les of redacted text in specific emails to provide further guidance on the manner in which specific material should be redacted when only a portion of an email is found to be privileged. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/14/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 30, 2009 Filing 149
REPLY to Response to 141 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand ; filed by Defendants Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Forum Shops, LLC, Counter Claimants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Shops, LLC. FORUM DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE JURY DEMAND (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
November 19, 2009 Filing 145
RESPONSE to 141 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. and Notice of Joinder Replies due by 12/3/2009. (Hunterton, C.)
November 10, 2009 Filing 142
Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants Love & Money, LLC and Phase II Chin, LLC ANSWER to 140 Counterclaim filed by Phase II Chin, LLC, Love & Money, LLC.(Oliveros, Louren)
October 27, 2009 Filing 140
Second Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Phase II Chin, LLC, Love & Money, LLC, filed by Forum Shops, LLC.(McCrea, Jr., Charles) .
October 23, 2009 Filing 139
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff Love & Money, LLC's Responses to Forum Defendants' Second Additional Discovery Requests to Plaintiff Love & Money, LLC by Plaintiff Love & Money, LLC. (Oliveros, Louren)
October 21, 2009 Filing 137
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff Love & Money, LLC's Second Set of Interrogatories, Third Set of Requests for Production, and Third Set of Requests for Admissions to the Forum Defendants by Plaintiff Love & Money, LLC. (Oliveros, Louren)
October 15, 2009 Filing 135
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Caesars Palace Corporation, Caesars Palace Realty Corporation. (Hendricks, JP)
September 14, 2009 Filing 134
MOTION to Amend/Correct the 131 First Amended Counterclaim, to File a Second Amended Counterclaim; by Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Counter Claimant Forum Shops, LLC. Responses due by 10/2/2009. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Docket entry relationship modified on 9/22/2009 (SRK).
August 12, 2009 Filing 133
Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants Love & Money, LLC and Phase II Chin, LLC's ANSWER to 131 Counterclaim filed by Phase II Chin, LLC, Love & Money, LLC.(Gorence, Robert)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 132
SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 1/13/2010. Motions due by 2/15/2010. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/17/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/3/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
July 28, 2009 Filing 131
Amended COUNTERCLAIM FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Phase II Chin, LLC, Love & Money, LLC, filed by Forum Shops, LLC.(McCrea, Jr., Charles)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130
ORDER granting 129 Motion to Amend Counterclaim. Defendants shall have 10 days to file and serve amended Counterclaim. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/27/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
June 10, 2009 Filing 129
MOTION to Amend/Correct 106 Answer to Complaint - Petition for Removal,, Counterclaim,. Motion for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim by Counter Claimant Forum Shops, LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2009. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128
ORDER granting 127 Verified Petition for Permission for Attorney Robert Jason Bowles to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Attorney Stanley Hunterton as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/21/09.
Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov
(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
May 20, 2009 Filing 127
Amended VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert Jason Bowles and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel C. Stanley Hunterton (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001238305) by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. Motion ripe 5/20/2009. (Hunterton, C.)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 126
PROTECTIVE ORDER Governing Confidentiality of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
May 11, 2009 Filing 124
STIPULATION STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiffs Phase II Chin, LLC, Love & Money, LLC, Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group, Inc., Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp., Counter Claimants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Counter Defendant Phase II Chin, LLC. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123
ORDER Granting 111 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Love & Money. Hunterton Law Firm for Harold P Gewerter. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
May 6, 2009 Filing 118
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. Motion ripe 5/6/2009. (Hunterton, C.)
May 5, 2009 Filing 116
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 5/5/2009. RE: 112 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert Jason Bowles. Counsel is directed to correct paragraphs 6 & 9 within 14 days. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
April 16, 2009 Filing 110
Plaintiffs/Counter Defendant's ANSWER to 106 Answer to Complaint - Petition for Removal,, Counterclaim, BY FORUM SHOPS filed by Phase II Chin, LLC.(Hunterton, C.)
April 9, 2009 Filing 109
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Love & Money, LLC.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Gewerter, Harold)
April 1, 2009 Filing 106
ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM OF FORUM DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint re 1 Petition for Removal, ( Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/11/2009., Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/16/2009.), COUNTERCLAIM against Phase II Chin, LLC filed by Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership.(McCrea, Jr., Charles)
March 31, 2009 Filing 105
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/10/2009. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/15/2009.(Hendricks, JP)
March 19, 2009 Filing 103
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, (PARTIAL MOTION HEARING - Argument of Harold Gewerter, Esq.) 98 Motion to Dismiss held on 3/12/09, before Judge James C. Mahan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joy Garner, 702-384-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 4/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2009. (ABB)
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 101
ORDER Affirming the 82 Order regarding the 70 MOTION to Disqualify Attorney Steve Morris and The Law Firm of Morris, Pickering (Now Morris Peterson). Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/18/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102
ORDER Denying the 12 MOTION to Dismiss and 20 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 03/17/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
March 16, 2009 Filing 100
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER re Motions to Dismiss 12 and 20 filed by Plaintiff Love & Money, LLC. (Gewerter, Harold) Modified to add link to motions on 3/19/2009 (MAJ).
March 12, 2009 Filing 99
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on 86 Objection to Document, 98 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,, ; filed by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (Morris, Steve)
March 11, 2009 Filing 97
RESPONSE to 86 Objection to Document, ; filed by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steve Morris, # 2 Declaration of Jeana Hart)(Morris, Steve)
March 10, 2009 Filing 96
RESPONSE to 94 MOTION for Hearing REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE re 20 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Defendants Simon Property Group Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group, Inc.. Replies due by 3/24/2009. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified text on 3/11/2009 (MAJ).
March 9, 2009 Filing 94
MOTION for Hearing REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE re 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. Motion ripe 3/9/2009. (Hunterton, C.)
March 6, 2009 Filing 93
SUPPLEMENT to 29 Response to Motion ; Correspondence dated March 5, 2009, to Judge Mahan by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. (Hunterton, C.)
February 25, 2009 Filing 91
EXHIBIT(s) "E" to 86 Objection to Document, ; filed by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. (Hunterton, C.)
February 24, 2009 Filing 85
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings 81 Motion to Disqualify Hearing held on 2/12/2009, before Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/17/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2009. (ABB)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82
ORDER Denying 70 Motion to Disqualify Attorney Steve Morris and the Law Firm of Morris Peterson. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 02/19/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
February 6, 2009 Filing 80
REPLY to Response to 70 MOTION to Disqualify Attorney Steve Morris and The Law Firm of Morris, Pickering (Now Morris Peterson); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Philip Heller and Jerold Fagelbaum MOTION to Disqualify Attorney Steve Morris and The Law Firm of Morris, Pickering (Now Morris Peterson); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Philip Heller and Jerold Fagelbaum ; filed by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. (Hunterton, C.)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 75 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File a Response to the 70 MOTION to Disqualify Attorney Steve Morris and The Law Firm of Morris, Pickering (Now Morris Peterson. Reply Deadline and Hearing Remain Unchanged. Responses due by 1/26/2009. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2009 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George W Foley Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 01/27/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
January 26, 2009 Filing 76
RESPONSE to 70 MOTION to Disqualify Attorney Steve Morris and The Law Firm of Morris, Pickering (Now Morris Peterson); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Philip Heller and Jerold Fagelbaum MOTION to Disqualify Attorney Steve Morris and The Law Firm of Morris, Pickering (Now Morris Peterson); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Philip Heller and Jerold Fagelbaum, filed by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. Replies due by 2/9/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Index, # 2 Declaration of Steve Morris, # 3 Declaration of Michael Kostrinsky, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4)(Morris, Steve)
January 23, 2009 Filing 75
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Deadlines for Opposition and Reply (First Request) by Defendant Caesars Palace Corp.. (Hendricks, JP)
January 22, 2009 Filing 74
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 73 MOTION for Hearing REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Hunterton, C.)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 69 Stipulation re Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorney Kristina Pickering terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 01/06/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
January 5, 2009 Filing 70
MOTION to Disqualify Attorney Steve Morris and The Law Firm of Morris, Pickering (Now Morris Peterson); Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declarations of Philip Heller and Jerold Fagelbaum by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. Motion ripe 1/5/2009. (Hunterton, C.)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68
ORDER Granting 67 Stipulation to Continue Hearing re 20 MOTION to Dismiss and 12 MOTION to Dismiss. ( Motions Hearing set for 2/6/2009 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/22/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
December 19, 2008 Filing 67
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Phase II Chin, LLC, Love & Money, LLC, Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group, Inc., Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND [PROPOSED] ORDER (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 65 Stipulation to Continue Hearings on the 12 MOTION to Dismiss and 20 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2008 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/26/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
November 25, 2008 Filing 65
STIPULATION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss OF DEFENDANTS FORUM SHOPS, LLC, FORUM DEVELOPERS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, SIMON PROPERTY GROUP LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AND SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. ; by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. (Hunterton, C.)
October 31, 2008 Filing 64
JOINDER Joinder in 63 Plaintiffs' Joint Status Report filed by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (Hendricks, JP) Modified to add link to status report on 11/3/2008 (MAJ).
October 30, 2008 Filing 63
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Phase II Chin, LLC, Love & Money, LLC. (Gewerter, Harold)
October 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 61 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on 20 MOTION to Dismiss and 12 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2008 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/28/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
October 27, 2008 Filing 61
STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (Pickering, Kristina)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59
ORDER: Plaintiff's 57 Motion to File a Reply to the Forum Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum is Granted. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/17/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
October 15, 2008 Filing 58
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Phase II Chin, LLC, Love & Money, LLC. (Gewerter, Harold)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55
ORDER GRANTING 54 Stipulation to Continue Hearing. Motion Hearing reset for 10/30/2008 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6A before Judge James C. Mahan re 12 20 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/3/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52
ORDER GRANTING Forum Defendants' 46 Motion to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss 12 . Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/2/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51
ORDER granting 50 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jerold Fagelbaum for Phase II Chin, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/1/08.
Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov
(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
September 29, 2008 Filing 50
First VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jerold Fagelbaum and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel C. Stanley Hunterton (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000001007676) Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. Motion ripe 9/29/2008. (Hunterton, C.)
September 26, 2008 Filing 49
RESPONSE to 46 MOTION for Leave to File, filed by Plaintiffs Phase II Chin, LLC, Love & Money, LLC. Replies due by 10/10/2008. (Gewerter, Harold)
September 24, 2008 Filing 48
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group, Inc. PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING FORUM DEFENDANTS' 46 MOTION TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS. (McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified to add docket relationship on 9/24/2008 (MAJ).
September 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 45
ORDER: Plaintiffs Phase II Chin, LLC and Love & Money, LLC's 42 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Defendants' 20 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 09/16/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
September 12, 2008 Filing 53
LETTER from C. Stanley Hunterton to Judge James C. Mahan re: 9/17/2008 Hearing. (OXC)
August 5, 2008 Filing 41
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 40 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Pickering, Kristina)
August 4, 2008 Filing 40
REPLY to Response to 20 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (Pickering, Kristina) Modified to add link to 41 corrected image on 8/6/2008 (MAJ).
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39
ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Caesars Defendants' Replies due by 8/4/2008 re 12 20 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
July 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38
SCHEDULING ORDER re: 24 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order 24 is granted,with the following modifications. If the Courts ruling on the pending Motion to Dismiss 20 does not dispose of the case in its entirety, a 270 day period of discovery will automatically commence upon the date of the Courts ruling on the Motion to Dismiss, without further court order. The parties shall have 60 days following the designation of expert witnesses in which to designate rebuttal experts. The deadline for dispositive motions and the pretrial order filing dates are correspondingly reset. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 7/31/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
July 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR REPLY by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (Hendricks, JP)
July 29, 2008 Filing 36
JOINDER to 20 MOTION to Dismiss ; JOINDER IN CO-DEFENDANTS' ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE IMMATERIAL, IMPERTINENT AND SCANDALOUS MATTER FROM PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McCrea, Jr., Charles)
July 28, 2008 Filing 33
REPLY to Response to 12 MOTION to Dismiss OF DEFENDANTS FORUM SHOPS, LLC, FORUM DEVELOPERS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, SIMON PROPERTY GROUP LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AND SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. ; filed by Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit f & g)(Lionel, Samuel)
July 25, 2008 Filing 32
First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages MOTION FOR ORDER EXTENDING PAGE LIMIT FOR REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FROM 20 PAGES TO 30 PAGES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION by Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership. Motion ripe 7/25/2008. (McCrea, Jr., Charles)
July 21, 2008 Filing 30
JOINDER to 29 Response to Motion ; filed by Plaintiff Love & Money, LLC. (Gewerter, Harold)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 25 Stipulation to Extend Time to File a Reply to the 12 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 7/28/2008. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 07/16/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR REPLY by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (Pickering, Kristina)
July 14, 2008 Filing 24
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. (Hunterton, C.)
July 7, 2008 Filing 23
RESPONSE to 12 MOTION to Dismiss OF DEFENDANTS FORUM SHOPS, LLC, FORUM DEVELOPERS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, SIMON PROPERTY GROUP LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AND SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC., filed by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss of Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited Partnership, and Simon Property Group, Inc. Replies due by 7/21/2008. (Hunterton, C.)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21
ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 7/14/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 7/2/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
July 1, 2008 Filing 20
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. Responses due by 7/19/2008. (Pickering, Kristina)
June 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 19
ORDER GRANTING 18 Stipulation to Extend Response. Responses due by 7/7/2008 re 12 MOTION to Dismiss OF DEFENDANTS FORUM SHOPS, LLC, FORUM DEVELOPERS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, SIMON PROPERTY GROUP LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, AND SIMON PROPERTY GROUP, INC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/23/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
June 20, 2008 Filing 18
STIPULATION and Order to Extend Time to File Opposition to Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited Partnership, and Simon Property Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. (Hunterton, C.)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17
ORDER granting 16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Phillip Heller for Phase II Chin, LLC and approving C. Stan Hunterton as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/9/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
April 7, 2008 Filing 16
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Philip Heller and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel C. Stanley Hunterton (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 09780000000000847241) by Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. Motion ripe 4/7/2008. (Hunterton, C.)
April 4, 2008 Filing 15
ERROR: Wrong event selected and Wrong Form used, Attorney advised to use correct form and refile under correct event (RFJ) NOTICE of Association of Counsel by C. Stanley Hunterton on behalf of Plaintiff Phase II Chin, LLC. Petition to Practice in this case only (Hunterton, C.) Modified on 4/4/2008.
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14
ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation regarding stay. The stay of proceedings, including discovery, until 7/1/08 or a date 30 days after the decision by the Delaware Court, whichever is earlier, shall remain in full force and effect and no opposition to the Motion to Dismiss 12 shall be filed until expiration of said stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 4/3/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
April 1, 2008 Filing 13
STIPULATION by Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group, Inc.. (Lionel, Samuel)
March 17, 2008 Filing 12
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited and Simon Property Group, Inc. Responses due by 4/4/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(McCrea, Jr., Charles) Modified filing parties on 3/17/2008 (MAJ). Modified text on 2/24/2009 (SRK).
March 4, 2008 Filing 11
Joint STATUS REPORT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (RFJ)
February 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 10
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting 7 Stipulation to stay and extend deadlines pending decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge George W Foley, Jr on 2/210/08. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
February 20, 2008 Filing 9
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 3 Order by Defendants Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2-7-08 Minute Order)(Pickering, Kristina) Modified to add docket relationship on 2/25/2008. (MAJ)
February 12, 2008 Filing 6
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Caesars Palace Corp., Caesars Palace Realty Corp... There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Pickering, Kristina)
February 8, 2008 Filing 5
STATEMENT of CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Defendants Forum Shops, LLC, Forum Developers Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group Limited Partnership, Simon Property Group, Inc.. (Lionel, Samuel)
February 7, 2008 Filing 3
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on 2/7/2008. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/22/2008 Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/8/2008 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
May 8, 2021 Filing 98
May 8, 2021 Filing 71
May 8, 2021 Filing 60
May 8, 2021 Filing 34
May 8, 2021 Filing 210
May 8, 2021 Filing 204
May 8, 2021 Filing 195
May 8, 2021 Filing 180
May 8, 2021 Filing 147
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phase II Chin, LLC et al v. Forum Shops, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phase II Chin, LLC
Represented By: C. Stanley Hunterton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Love & Money, LLC
Represented By: Harold P Gewerter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forum Shops, LLC
Represented By: Samuel S. Lionel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forum Developers Limited Partnership
Represented By: Samuel S. Lionel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Property Group Limited Partnership
Represented By: Samuel S. Lionel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Property Group, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel S. Lionel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Palace Corp.
Represented By: Kristina Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Palace Realty Corp.
Represented By: Kristina Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?